EP3254532 - HEATING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spectrum Brands, Inc. 3001 Deming Way Middleton, WI 53562 / US | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Jacob Daniel 6113 Wiinequah Road Monona, WI 53716 / US | 02 /
MCNERNEY, Gerald Joseph 7433 Meadowrue Circle Middleton, WI 53462 / US | 03 /
MCCLUNG, William James 3001 Deming Way Middleton, WI 53562 / US | 04 /
KLOCK, Casey Aaron 5657 Pennwall Street Fitchburg, WI 53711 / US | [2018/24] |
Former [2017/50] | 01 /
SMITH, Jacob Daniel 6113 Wiinequah Road Monona, Wisconsin 53716 / US | ||
02 /
MCNERNEY, Gerald Joseph 7433 Meadowrue Circle Middleton, Wisconsin 53462 / US | |||
03 /
MCCLUNG, William James 3001 Deming Way Middleton, Wisconsin 53562 / US | |||
04 /
KLOCK, Casey Aaron 5657 Pennwall Street Fitchburg, Wisconsin 53711 / US | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 16747122.6 | 02.02.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016US16186 | Priority number, date | US201562110960P | 02.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562110960 P | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016126714 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3254532 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H05B1/02, A47J37/01, F24C7/08, F24C7/04, A47J37/06, H05B3/00, F24C15/32 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
F24C7/087 (EP,US);
A47J37/0635 (US);
A47J37/0641 (EP,US);
F24C15/325 (US);
F24C7/046 (EP,US);
H05B1/0258 (EP,US);
H05B3/0076 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/50] | H05B1/02, A47J37/01, F24C7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Title | German: | HEIZGERÄT | [2017/50] | English: | HEATING APPLIANCE | [2017/50] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 19.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/04] | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010006561 (HENSEL KEITH JAMES [AU], et al) [X] 8-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011148170 (AGA CONSUMER PRODUCTS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 8-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013020162 (BREVILLE R & D PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 8-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004069155 (SHEI STEVEN M [US]) [A] 8-12 * the whole document *; | [A]KR100512533B (QUADLUX QUADROX INC [KR]) [A] 8-12 * the whole document * | International search | [XY]US6369360 (COOK EDWARD R [US]) [X] 1-5 and 7-14 * ; figures 1, 2b, 3, 9; column 3, lines 25-35; column 4, lines 1-45; column 5, lines 1-35; column 6, lines 20-30 * [Y] 6 and 16; | [XY]US2003047553 (PATTI ANTHONY [US], et al) [X] 15 and 17-20 * ; figures 1-4, 9, 13a; paragraphs [0042-0059, 0070-0079] * [Y] 6 and 16; | [A]US4345145 (NORWOOD RICHARD L) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document * |