EP3254116 - USE OF VISCOELASTIC ANALYSIS FOR PREDICTING MASSIVE HEMORRHAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of Colorado, A Body Corporate 1800 Grant Street, 8th Floor Denver, CO 80203 / US | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPMAN, Michael, P. 805 E 7th Avenue Apt. 10 Denver, CO 80218 / US | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Somervell, Thomas Richard Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 16747211.7 | 03.02.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016US16412 | Priority number, date | US201562111553P | 03.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562111553 P | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016126849 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3254116 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/86 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/86 (EP,US);
A61B5/02042 (EP,US);
G01N33/4905 (EP,US);
A61B2505/05 (US);
G01N2800/22 (EP,US);
G01N2800/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER VISKOELASTISCHEN ANALYSE ZUR VORHERSAGE VON MASSIVEN BLUTUNGEN | [2017/50] | English: | USE OF VISCOELASTIC ANALYSIS FOR PREDICTING MASSIVE HEMORRHAGE | [2017/50] | French: | UTILISATION D'ANALYSE VISCOÉLASTIQUE POUR PRÉDICTION D'HÉMORRAGIE MASSIVE | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 15.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 15.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - HOLCOMB JOHN B ET AL, "Admission rapid thrombelastography can replace conventional coagulation tests in the emergency department: experience with 1974 consecutive trauma patients.", ANNALS OF SURGERY SEP 2012, (201209), vol. 256, no. 3, ISSN 1528-1140, pages 476 - 486, XP009505559 [X] 1-10,12,13 * Whole document, in particular abstract and Table 4 * [I] 11,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/SLA.0b013e3182658180 | [X] - PÄR I JOHANSSON ET AL, "Current management of massive hemorrhage in trauma", SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF TRAUMA, RESUSCITATION AND EMERGENCY MEDICINE, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON UK, (20120709), vol. 20, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1757-7241-20-47, ISSN 1757-7241, page 47, XP021117293 [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10-13 * whole document , in particular abstract; Figure 1 ; Table 1 ; paragraph bridging left and right column of page 50 ; conclusions * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1757-7241-20-47 | [X] - MICHAEL T. GANTER ET AL, "Coagulation Monitoring: Current Techniques and Clinical Use of Viscoelastic Point-of-Care Coagulation Devices", ANESTHESIA & ANALGESIA, (20080501), vol. 106, no. 5, doi:10.1213/ane.0b013e318168b367, ISSN 0003-2999, pages 1366 - 1375, XP055039818 [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10-13 * whole document, in particular abstract and conclusions, Table 2 and Figure 3; * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1213/ane.0b013e318168b367 | [X] - H.P. PHAM ET AL, "Update on massive transfusion", BRITISH JOURNAL OF ANAESTHESIA., GB, (20131201), vol. 111, doi:10.1093/bja/aet376, ISSN 0007-0912, pages i71 - i82, XP055477215 [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10-13 * whole document, in particular abstract ; Figure 2; Table 5; paragraph bridging pages 177-178 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bja/aet376 | International search | [X]US2011268732 (JOHANSSON PAER [SE]) [X] 1, 2,4-8, 10-13 * ; figure 1; paragraphs [0067], [0071], [0110], [0121], [0273], [0275], [0373] *; | [X]US2013261177 (JOHANSSON PAER [SE], et al) [X] 1, 2, 8, 9 * ; figure 1; paragraphs [0022], [0023], [0346], [0349] *; | [A]US2010062981 (JEPPSSON ANDERS [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2012301967 (NADKARNI SEEMANTINI K [US]) [A] 1-13 * ; entire document *; | [A]RU2517116 (G BJUDZHETNOE UCHREZHDENIE SANKT PETERBURGSKIJ NII SKOROJ POMOSHCHI IM I I DZHANELIDZE [RU]) [A] 1-13 * ; entire document * | [A] - GREGORY SEMON, DO, "THROMBOELASTOGRAPHY (TEG) IN TRAUMA", (20141203), URL: http://www.surgicalcdticalcare.net/Guidelines/TEG2014.pdf, XP009505390 [A] 1-13 |