EP3254369 - RELIABLE CONTROL OF HIGH ROTOR POLE SWITCHED RELUCTANCE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Turntide Technologies Inc. 1295 Forgewood Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2020/40] |
Former [2018/10] | For all designated states Software Motor Company 1295 Forgewood Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2017/50] | For all designated states Software Motor Corporation 1295 Forgewood Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRISHNAMURTHY, Mahesh 1295 Forgewood Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 02 /
CREARY, Trevor 1295 Forgewood Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2023/36] |
Former [2017/50] | Atkinson, Jennifer Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16747301.6 | 04.02.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016US16650 | Priority number, date | US201562111781P | 04.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562111781 P | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016126998 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3254369 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3254369 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/185, H02P25/089 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
H02P25/089 (EP,CN,US);
H02P6/185 (EP,CN,US);
H02P6/186 (CN,US);
H02P2203/01 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2017/50] | H02P6/185 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUVERLÄSSIGE STEUERUNG EINER GESCHALTETEN RELUKTANZMASCHINE MIT HOHEM ROTORPOL | [2017/50] | English: | RELIABLE CONTROL OF HIGH ROTOR POLE SWITCHED RELUCTANCE MACHINE | [2017/50] | French: | COMMANDE FIABLE D'UNE MACHINE À RÉLUCTANCE COMMUTÉE À GRAND NOMBRE DE PÔLES DE ROTOR | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 03.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 31.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 31.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.08.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004124806 (EHSANI MEHRDAD [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002]; figures 1,3; claim 1 * * paragraph [0068]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0055] *; | [A]US2004189240 (ISLAM MOHAMMAD S [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0033]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US8125170 (FAHIMI BABAK [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 15 - line 45; figures 1-9 * * column 3, line 16 - column 6, line 11 *; | [A]US2012146626 (BIELER THIERRY [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0107] * | International search | [A]US4520302 (HILL ROLAND J [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US4772839 (MACMINN STEPHEN R [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [Y]US5254914 (DUNFIELD JOHN C [US], et al) [Y] 2, 4, 7, 9, 11-20 * entire document *; | [XY]US8125170 (FAHIMI BABAK [US], et al) [X] 1, 3, 5, 6, 8, 10 * entire document * [Y] 2, 4, 7, 9, 11-20 | Examination | - CHI H P ET AL, "Improved mutual voltage technique of indirect rotor position sensing in switched reluctance motor", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE; [ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE],, (20020623), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-7262-7, pages 271 - 275, XP010596099 | - TIAN-HUA LIU ET AL, "Implementation of a sensorless switched reluctance drive with self-inductance estimating technique", IECON-2002. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 28TH. ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS SOCIETY. SEVILLA, SPAIN, NOV. 5 - 8, 2002; [ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS SOCIETY], IEEE, NEW YORK,NY, US, (20021105), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/IECON.2002.1187560, ISBN 978-0-7803-7474-4, pages 508 - 513, XP010633209 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IECON.2002.1187560 | by applicant | US2004124806 | US8125170 |