EP3326124 - OPERATOR IDENTIFICATION AND PERFORMANCE TRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Locus Robotics Corp. 301 Ballardvale Street Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Mike 65 Hardwick Road Ashland, MA 01721 / US | 02 /
POWERS, Bradley 130 John Street Apt. 552 Lowell, MA 01852 / US | 03 /
WELTY, Bruce 142 Northern Avenue 100 Pier 4, nr. 1805 Boston, MA 02210 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Sean 9 Morgan Drive Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | 01 /
JOHNSON, Mike 65 Hardwick Road Ashland, MA 01721 / US | ||
02 /
POWERS, Bradley 130 John Street Apt. 552 Lowell, MA 01852 / US | |||
03 /
WELTY, Bruce 142 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | |||
04 /
JOHNSON, Sean 9 Morgan Drive Danvers, MA 01923 / US | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16748041.7 | 01.08.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016US44988 | Priority number, date | US201514815110 | 31.07.2015 Original published format: US201514815110 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017023843 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3326124 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08, G06Q50/28, G06Q10/06 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06398 (EP,KR,US);
B65G1/1378 (KR,US);
G05B19/042 (KR,US);
G05D1/0022 (US);
G05D1/0234 (US);
G05D1/0261 (EP,US);
G06K7/10297 (US);
G06K7/10366 (KR,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q10/1091 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0635 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | BETREIBERIDENTIFIKATION UND LEISTUNGSVERFOLGUNG | [2018/22] | English: | OPERATOR IDENTIFICATION AND PERFORMANCE TRACKING | [2018/22] | French: | IDENTIFICATION ET SUIVI DES PERFORMANCES D'OPÉRATEUR | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 23.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.12.2019 | 20.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.07.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 11.09.2020 | Appeal received No. T1960/20 | 13.11.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.06.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 11.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2006076283 (ELECTRONIC DATA SYST CORP [US], et al); | [I]WO2008013846 (SENSORMATIC ELECTRONICS CORP [US]); | [I]WO2008074008 (CROWN EQUIP CORP [US]); | [I]US2013317642 (ASARIA ALI [CA], et al); | [I]US2014254896 (ZHOU TIGER T G [US], et al); | [I]US2014277691 (JACOBUS CHARLES J [US], et al) |