EP3326065 - LEADERLESS CONSISTENCY PROTOCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB, IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARRAHI MOGHADDAM, Fereydoun 672 Ave. Van Dyck Brossard, Québec J4W 2E5 / CA | 02 /
KANSO, Ali 24208 Town Green Drive Elmsford, New York 10523 / US | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Laqua, Bernd Christian Kurt Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | Laqua, Bernd Christian Kurt Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16748351.0 | 25.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016IB54431 | Priority number, date | US201562196011P | 23.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562196011 P | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017013636 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3326065 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3326065 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/52, G06F9/46, G06F11/18, G06F11/14 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G06F9/466 (EP,US);
H04L67/1097 (US);
G06F11/1474 (EP,US);
G06F11/18 (EP,US);
G06F11/183 (EP,US);
G06F9/52 (EP,US);
H04L67/1095 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/22] | G06F9/52, G06F9/46, G06F11/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITUNGSLOSES KONSISTENZPROTOKOLL | [2018/22] | English: | LEADERLESS CONSISTENCY PROTOCOL | [2018/22] | French: | PROTOCOLE DE COHÉRENCE SANS NOEUD PRINCIPAL | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 20.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | MC | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | IE | 25.07.2023 | LU | 25.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | FR | 31.07.2023 | GB | 31.08.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | DE | 01.02.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
IT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
DE | 01.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
DE | 01.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
DE | 01.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2007143299 (HURAS MATTHEW A [CA], et al) [I] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US7478400 (BANERJEE ANINDYA [IN], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [A]US2013290249 (MERRIMAN DWIGHT [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |