EP3258226 - COMBINATION WEIGHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ishida Co., Ltd. 44, Sanno-cho Shogoin Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8392 / JP | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIWAKI Takakazu c/o Shiga Integrated Facility Ishida Co. Ltd. 959-1 Shimomagari Ritto-shi Shiga 520-3026 / JP | 02 /
IKEDA Shinya c/o Shiga Integrated Facility Ishida Co. Ltd. 959-1 Shimomagari Ritto-shi Shiga 520-3026 / JP | 03 /
KAGEYAMA Toshiharu c/o Shiga Integrated Facility Ishida Co. Ltd. 959-1 Shimomagari Ritto-shi Shiga 520-3026 / JP | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 16749128.1 | 03.02.2016 | [2017/51] | WO2016JP53241 | Priority number, date | JP20150000579U | 09.02.2015 Original published format: JP 2015000579 U | [2017/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016129484 | Date: | 18.08.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3258226 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3258226 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/393 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
G01G19/393 (EP,US);
G01G11/00 (US);
G01G13/24 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/51] | G01G19/387 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSWIEGEVORRICHTUNG | [2017/51] | English: | COMBINATION WEIGHING DEVICE | [2017/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PESAGE COMBINÉ | [2017/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2017 | Translation filed | 07.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 07.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2016 | AL | 06.01.2021 | AT | 06.01.2021 | CY | 06.01.2021 | CZ | 06.01.2021 | DK | 06.01.2021 | EE | 06.01.2021 | ES | 06.01.2021 | FI | 06.01.2021 | HR | 06.01.2021 | IT | 06.01.2021 | LT | 06.01.2021 | LV | 06.01.2021 | MC | 06.01.2021 | MK | 06.01.2021 | MT | 06.01.2021 | PL | 06.01.2021 | RO | 06.01.2021 | RS | 06.01.2021 | SE | 06.01.2021 | SI | 06.01.2021 | SK | 06.01.2021 | SM | 06.01.2021 | TR | 06.01.2021 | IE | 03.02.2021 | LU | 03.02.2021 | NL | 06.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | FR | 06.03.2021 | BG | 06.04.2021 | NO | 06.04.2021 | GR | 07.04.2021 | IS | 06.05.2021 | PT | 06.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 03.02.2016 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
MK | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
TR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 03.02.2016 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
MK | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 03.02.2016 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013179849 (ISHIDA SEISAKUSHO [JP]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * Combination weigher, Weighing hopper, Control unit,; page 1 * * Control unit, distribution unit, dispersion unit; page 2 * * Camera 60, Pool Hoppers; page 5 *[I] 2-7 | International search | [A]JPS58193225U (Ishida Scales Mfg. Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH05330632 (YAMATO SCALE CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0004], [0014] to [0021]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0643012 (ISHIDA SEISAKUSHO) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0001], [0010] to [0015]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005538433 (Global Sensor Systems Inc.) [A] 1-8* , paragraphs [0001], [0016] to [0020]; fig. 1 & WO 2003/102501 A1 description, page 1, lines 6 to 9; page 5, line 17 to page 7, line 11; fig. 1 & US 2006/0020476 A1 & CN 1659419 A * |