EP3328507 - PREACTION SPRINKLER VALVE ASSEMBLIES, RELATED DRY SPRINKLER DEVICES AND FIRE PROTECTION SPRINKLER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Globe Fire Sprinkler Corporation 4077 Airpark Drive Standish, MI 48658 / US | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Stephen, J. 1135 Braefield Road Chester Springs, PA 19425 / US | 02 /
RINGER, Yoram 499 Elmgrove Avenue Providence, RI 02906 / US | 03 /
ARCHIBALD, Thomas Edwin 3611 Applewood Road Midland, MI 48640 / US | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2018/23] | Application number, filing date | 16750574.2 | 28.07.2016 | [2018/23] | WO2016US44569 | Priority number, date | US201562197927P | 28.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562197927 P | US201562198428P | 29.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562198428 P | US201562267445P | 15.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562267445 P | US201662304585P | 07.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662304585 P | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017019904 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3328507 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A62C37/42, A62C3/00, A62C35/62, A62C37/11 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
A62C37/42 (EP,KR,US);
A62C3/004 (EP,KR,US);
A62C35/62 (EP,KR,US);
A62C37/11 (EP,KR,US);
A62C37/48 (EP,KR,US);
F16K1/2007 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Title | German: | PREACTION-SPRINKLER-VENTILANORDNUNGEN, ZUGEHÖRIGE TROCKENSPRINKLERVORRICHTUNGEN UND BRANDSCHUTZSPRINKLERSYSTEME | [2018/23] | English: | PREACTION SPRINKLER VALVE ASSEMBLIES, RELATED DRY SPRINKLER DEVICES AND FIRE PROTECTION SPRINKLER SYSTEMS | [2018/23] | French: | ENSEMBLES ROBINETS D'EXTINCTEURS À PRÉACTION, DISPOSITIFS EXTINCTEURS À AIR COMPRIMÉ ASSOCIÉS ET SYSTÈMES D'EXTINCTEURS DE PROTECTION CONTRE LE FEU | [2018/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 25.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE20209353U (PREUSSAG AG MINIMAX [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005121206 (DOLAN KEVIN M [US]) [A] 1,14,21,22* figure -; claim - *; | [Y]US2007000671 (REILLY WILLIAM J [US], et al) [Y] 14-16,19,21,22 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005]; figure -; claim - *; | [XY]US2007007020 (CHASE BARRY D [US]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [Y] 14-16,19,21,22; | [X]US2011214888 (ALCHALEL ELAN [IL], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0047] , [0058] - [0064]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]CN103845836 (UNIV SHENYANG LIGONG) [X] 1-5,7,8,21,22 * abstract * | by applicant | US775431 | US5775431 | US2012298383 | US2013199803 | US2013319696 | US8887822 |