EP3331736 - METHOD FOR PUTTING A BRAKE SYSTEM HAVING SPECIFIED APPROVAL PREREQUISITES INTO SERVICE AND SYSTEM FOR PUTTING A BRAKE SYSTEM HAVING SPECIFIED APPROVAL PREREQUISITES INTO SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2024 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUNWALD, Torsten Am Strandbad 11 82418 Seehausen am Staffelsee / DE | 02 /
AURICH, Stefan Köhlstr. 6 1/2 86316 Friedberg / DE | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Stefan Schneeglöckchenstr. 28a 80995 München / DE | 04 /
GÜNTHER, Frank Feldmochinger Str. 240 80993 München / DE | 05 /
KROPP, Matthias Eggmühler Str. 28A 80993 München / DE | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 16750714.4 | 02.08.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016EP68415 | Priority number, date | DE201510113078 | 07.08.2015 Original published format: DE102015113078 | [2018/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017025384 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3331736 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3331736 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/66, B60T17/22, G01M17/08 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
B60T17/228 (EP,US);
B60T13/665 (EP,US);
B60T17/221 (EP,US);
B60T8/1705 (US);
B60T8/172 (US);
G01M17/08 (EP,US);
B60T2210/12 (US);
B60T2270/413 (US);
B60T8/176 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INBETRIEBNAHME EINES BREMSSYSTEMS MIT VORGEGEBENEN ZULASSUNGSVORAUSSETZUNGEN SOWIE SYSTEM ZUR INBETRIEBNAHME EINES BREMSSYSTEMS MIT VORGEGEBENEN ZULASSUNGSVORAUSSETZUNGEN | [2018/24] | English: | METHOD FOR PUTTING A BRAKE SYSTEM HAVING SPECIFIED APPROVAL PREREQUISITES INTO SERVICE AND SYSTEM FOR PUTTING A BRAKE SYSTEM HAVING SPECIFIED APPROVAL PREREQUISITES INTO SERVICE | [2018/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN SERVICE D'UN SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE AVEC DES CONDITIONS D'AUTORISATION PRÉDÉFINIES ET SYSTÈME DE MISE EN SERVICE D'UN SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE AVEC DES CONDITIONS D'AUTORISATION PRÉDÉFINIES | [2018/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 21.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.01.2020
07.01.2020
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE Opponent's representative Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/10] |
Former [2020/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.01.2020
07.01.2020
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | 19.03.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.07.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 17.02.2022 | Appeal received No. T0440/22 | 17.02.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 20.04.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.06.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 12.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2016 | AL | 03.04.2019 | CY | 03.04.2019 | EE | 03.04.2019 | HR | 03.04.2019 | LT | 03.04.2019 | LV | 03.04.2019 | MC | 03.04.2019 | MK | 03.04.2019 | MT | 03.04.2019 | RO | 03.04.2019 | RS | 03.04.2019 | SI | 03.04.2019 | SK | 03.04.2019 | SM | 03.04.2019 | BG | 03.07.2019 | NO | 03.07.2019 | GR | 04.07.2019 | IE | 02.08.2019 | LU | 02.08.2019 | IS | 03.08.2019 | PT | 03.08.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 02.08.2016 | |
AL | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
MT | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IE | 02.08.2019 | ||
LU | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 02.08.2016 | |
AL | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IE | 02.08.2019 | ||
LU | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IE | 02.08.2019 | ||
LU | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IE | 02.08.2019 | ||
LU | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
LU | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | LT | 03.04.2019 | |
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 03.04.2019 | |
NO | 03.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004163451 (KIM BONG-TAEK [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0018] , [0065] , [0072] - [0083]; figures 3,6 *; | [A]CN103309241 (SHENYANG AIRCRAFT DESIGN INST AVIAT IND CORP CHINA) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [AD]WO2014029581 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * page 4, paragraph 3 * | Opposition | DE102011113024 | CN104374586 | - Anonymous, "Bahnanwendungen-Bremse-Gleitschutz; Deutsche Fassung EN 15595-2009 / Railway applications- Braking- Wheel slide protection; German version EN 15595:2009 / Applications ferroviaires- Freinage- Anti-enrayeur; Version allemande EN 15595:2009", Deutsche Norm DIN EN 15595, (20110100), pages 1 - 69, XP055666009 | - Maksym Spiryagin & Colin Cole, "Hardware-in-the-loop simulations for railway research", Vehicle System Dynamics, (2013), vol. 51, no. 4, pages 497 - 498, XP055666015 | - Lionel Belmon, "High-speed train pneumatic braking system with wheel-slide protection device: A modelling application from system design to HIL testing", Proceedings 8th Modelica Conference, Dresden, Germany, (20110320), pages 549 - 556, XP055666033 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3384/ecp11063549 | - Ho-Yeon Kim et al.,, "Hardware-in-the Loop Simulation for a Wheel Slide Protection System of a Railway Train", Proceedings of the 19th World Congress, (20140824), pages 12134 - 12139, XP055666023 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3182/20140824-6-ZA-1003.02106 | - Florian Sumpf et al.,, "TrainBraC - Bremsberechnungsprogramm für Auslegung und Nachweisführung", ETR, (20100600), no. 6, pages 367 - 372, XP055666029 |