EP3278245 - AUTOMATIC QUERY PATTERN GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHMIEL, Tomer GOOGLE INC. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
KEYSAR, Dvir GOOGLE INC. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
COHEN, Vered GOOGLE INC. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/06] | Robinson, David Edward Ashdown Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16751112.0 | 04.08.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016US45484 | Priority number, date | US201562200819P | 04.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562200819 P | US201615227456 | 03.08.2016 Original published format: US201615227456 | [2018/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017024108 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3278245 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
G06F16/90324 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/285 (US);
G06F16/2455 (EP,US);
G06F16/24573 (EP,US);
G06F16/9024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE ABFRAGEMUSTERERZEUGUNG | [2018/06] | English: | AUTOMATIC QUERY PATTERN GENERATION | [2018/06] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE MODÈLE DE REQUÊTE AUTOMATIQUE | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 30.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/44] | 27.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.06.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2010161642 (CHEN ZHENG [CN], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0018] - [0020] - [0026] - [0031]; claim - *; | [I]US2012259801 (JI LEI [CN], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0 37] - [0049] - [0052]; figures 1-3,5-7; claim - * * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0037] - [0049] - [0052]; figures 1-3,5-7; claim - *; | [I]US2014358889 (SHMIEL TOMER [IL], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0008] - [0010] - [0026] - [0031] - [0034] - [0038] - [0040] , [0045] - [0048] - [0051] , [0052] , [0059] , [0060]; figures 1,3,4-7 *; | [I]US2015081656 (WANG HENG [CN], et al) [I] 1-20* paragraphs [0005] , [0011] , [0032] , [0038] , [0041] - [0044] - [0047] , [0096] , [0099]; figures 1,4,5 * |