EP3328617 - METHOD FOR JOINING A DEVICE TO AN OBJECT WITH THE AID OF ULTRASONIC VIBRATION ENERGY AND INSTALLATION SUITABLE FOR THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/23] | METHOD FOR JOINING A DEVICE TO AN OBJECT WITH THE AID OF ULTRASONIC VIBRATION ENERGY AND DEVICE AND INSTALLATION SUITABLE FOR THE METHOD | ||
[2019/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WoodWelding AG Mühlebach 2 6362 Stansstad / CH | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOCK, Elmar Rue du Général-Dufour 4 CH-2502 Biel/Bienne / CH | 02 /
TORRIANI, Laurent La Reposière 2 2516 Lamboing / CH | 03 /
LEHMANN, Mario Haut-du-Village 31 2353 Les Pommerats / CH | 04 /
POSCHNER, Patricia Spichersried 2 3043 Uettligen / CH | 05 /
KVIST, Joakim Strandweg 32 2560 Nidau / CH | 06 /
MAYER, Jörg Lerchenweg 6 5702 Niederlenz / CH | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 16751147.6 | 26.07.2016 | [2018/23] | WO2016CH00106 | Priority number, date | CH20150001104 | 29.07.2015 Original published format: CH 11042015 | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017015769 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3328617 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3328617 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/08, B29C65/36, B29C65/72, B29C65/48, B29C65/50 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C65/3608 (EP,US);
B29C65/3612 (EP,US);
B29C65/3616 (EP,US);
B29C65/364 (EP,US);
B29C65/3676 (EP,US);
B29C65/368 (EP,US);
B29C65/3684 (EP,US);
B29C65/4815 (EP,US);
B29C65/5057 (EP,US);
B29C65/606 (EP,US);
B29C65/608 (EP,US);
B29C65/72 (EP,US);
B29C66/0242 (EP,US);
B29C66/21 (EP,US);
B29C66/30322 (EP,US);
B29C66/30325 (EP,US);
B29C66/30326 (EP,US);
B29C66/30341 (EP,US);
B29C66/3472 (EP,US);
B29C66/3474 (EP,US);
B29C66/3494 (EP,US);
B29C66/47 (EP,US);
B29C66/474 (EP,US);
B29C66/72525 (EP,US);
B29C66/7392 (EP,US);
B29C66/7487 (EP,US);
B29C66/81427 (EP,US);
B29C66/81431 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29C66/91441 (EP,US);
B29C66/91645 (EP,US);
B29C66/91651 (EP,US);
B29C66/91655 (EP,US);
B29C66/9192 (EP,US);
B29C66/92443 (EP,US);
B29C66/9292 (EP,US);
B29C65/3648 (EP,US);
B29C65/3696 (EP,US);
B29C65/4875 (EP,US);
B29C65/488 (EP,US);
B29C65/4885 (EP,US);
B29C65/489 (EP,US);
B29C65/607 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM OBJEKT MITHILFE VON ULTRASCHALLSCHWINGUNGSENERGIE UND FÜR DAS VERFAHREN GEEIGNETE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/52] | English: | METHOD FOR JOINING A DEVICE TO AN OBJECT WITH THE AID OF ULTRASONIC VIBRATION ENERGY AND INSTALLATION SUITABLE FOR THE METHOD | [2019/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE JONCTION D'UN DISPOSITIF À UN OBJET À L'AIDE D'ÉNERGIE VIBRATOIRE ULTRASONIQUE ET INSTALLATION CONVENANT AU PROCÉDÉ | [2019/52] |
Former [2018/23] | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM OBJEKT MITHILFE VON ULTRASCHALLSCHWINGUNGSENERGIE UND FÜR DAS VERFAHREN GEEIGNETE VORRICHTUNG UND ANLAGE | ||
Former [2018/23] | METHOD FOR JOINING A DEVICE TO AN OBJECT WITH THE AID OF ULTRASONIC VIBRATION ENERGY AND DEVICE AND INSTALLATION SUITABLE FOR THE METHOD | ||
Former [2018/23] | PROCÉDÉ DE JONCTION D'UN DISPOSITIF À UN OBJET À L'AIDE D'ÉNERGIE VIBRATOIRE ULTRASONIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ET INSTALLATION CONVENANT AU PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 25.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2016 | AL | 10.06.2020 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | ES | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | TR | 10.06.2020 | IE | 26.07.2020 | LU | 26.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.07.2016 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MT | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IE | 26.07.2020 | ||
LU | 26.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
IE | 26.07.2020 | ||
LU | 26.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 26.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 26.07.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO9842988 (CREAHOLIC SA [CH], et al) [XD] 14-19 * figure 1 * * page 11, lines 23-25 *; | [XA]DE102011106693 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [X] 20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0031] , [0032] , [0035]; figures 1-3 *[A] 21; | [XA]EP2724840 (ROPEX IND ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 20 * abstract * * pages 14,49 * [A] 1; | [A]EP2796272 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0059] , [0060] * | by applicant | WO9601377 | WO9842988 | WO2006002569 | - THOMAS BAYERL ET AL., Compsites, ELSEVIER, (2014), vol. 57, pages 27 - 40 |