EP3261099 - TWO-CORE BALANCED CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Junkosha Inc. 961-20, Fukuda Kasama-shi, Ibaraki 309-1603 / JP | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMOSAWA Katsuo 961-20 Fukuda Kasama-shi Ibaraki 309-1603 / JP | 02 /
MATSUBARA Yuu 961-20 Fukuda Kasama-shi Ibaraki 309-1603 / JP | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/52] | Hansen, Norbert Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16752305.9 | 04.02.2016 | [2017/52] | WO2016JP53354 | Priority number, date | JP20150032360 | 20.02.2015 Original published format: JP 2015032360 | [2017/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016132918 | Date: | 25.08.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3261099 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01B11/06, H01B7/17, H01B11/00, H01B7/02, H01B7/04, H01B7/18, H01B3/44, H01B11/02 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
H01B11/02 (US);
H01B11/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01B3/445 (EP,US);
H01B7/025 (EP,US);
H01B7/04 (US);
H01B7/041 (EP,US);
H01B7/08 (KR);
H01B7/17 (KR);
H01B7/18 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/52] | H01B11/06, H01B7/17, H01B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Title | German: | SYMMETRISCHES DOPPELADRIGES KABEL | [2017/52] | English: | TWO-CORE BALANCED CABLE | [2017/52] | French: | CÂBLE ÉQUILIBRÉ À DEUX ÂMES | [2017/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2017 | Translation filed | 11.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 11.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/35] | 15.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2011088926 (GROGL FERDINAND [DE], et al) [X] 1,3 * figure 1 * [Y] 2; | [X]WO2011074693 (JUNKOSHA INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * figure 1 *; | [X]JP2007165004 (JUNKOSHA CO LTD) [X] 1,3 * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2013111718 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 2 * figure 1A *; | [A]JP2003297157 (OKANO ELECTRIC WIRE) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0008]; figure 5 * | International search | [A]JP2007165004 (JUNKOSHA CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0010] to [0020]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011054410 (YOSHINOKAWA ELECTRIC WIRE & CABLE CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0038]; fig. 1 to 4 & US 2011/0048764 A1 paragraphs [0025] to [0043]; fig. 1 to 4 * |