EP3328909 - UREA URETHANES FOR RHEOLOGY CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/23] | UREAURETHANES FOR RHEOLOGY CONTROL | ||
[2019/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYK-Chemie GmbH Abelstraße 45 46438 Wesel / DE | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBERHARDT, Marc Wilhelm-Schneider-Strasse 24 46485 Wesel / DE | 02 /
NAGELSDIEK, René Schmidtskamp 8 46499 Hamminkeln / DE | 03 /
BÜHNE, Sylvia Rheindeichstrasse 67 47198 Duisburg / DE | 04 /
OMEIS, Jürgen Wiesental 35 46286 Dorsten-Lembeck / DE | 05 /
KLEIN, Agnetha ALTANA Management Services GmbH Abelstrasse 45 46483 Wesel / DE | [2019/26] |
Former [2018/23] | 01 /
EBERHARDT, Marc Wilhelm-Schneider-Strasse 24 46485 Wesel / DE | ||
02 /
NAGELSDIEK, René Schmidtskamp 8 46499 Hamminkeln / DE | |||
03 /
BÜHNE, Sylvia Rheindeichstrasse 67 47198 Duisburg / DE | |||
04 /
OMEIS, Jürgen Wiesental 35 46286 Dorsten-Lembeck / DE | |||
05 /
SCHMITT, Agnetha Schlesischer Ring 2 45894 Gelsenkirchen / DE | Representative(s) | Altana IP Department Altana Management Services GmbH Abelstraße 45 46483 Wesel / DE | [2018/23] | Application number, filing date | 16753261.3 | 22.07.2016 | [2018/23] | WO2016EP67588 | Priority number, date | EP20150178541 | 27.07.2015 Original published format: EP 15178541 | [2018/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017017036 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3328909 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3328909 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/04, C07C273/18, C07C275/26, C07C275/40, C08G18/67, C08G18/76, C08G18/81, C08G18/32, C09D7/45 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
C07C275/40 (EP,US);
C07C273/18 (EP,US);
C07C275/26 (EP,US);
C08G18/324 (EP,US);
C08G18/6715 (EP,US);
C08G18/675 (US);
C08G18/7621 (EP,US);
C08G18/8166 (EP,US);
C08L75/04 (EP,US);
C08L75/16 (US);
C09D5/04 (EP,US);
C09D7/45 (EP,US);
B01J20/291 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/23] | C08G18/28, C09D5/04, C07C273/18, C07C275/26, C07C275/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARNSTOFFURETHANE ZUR RHEOLOGIESTEUERUNG | [2018/23] | English: | UREA URETHANES FOR RHEOLOGY CONTROL | [2019/11] | French: | URÉE-URÉTHANE DESTINÉE À LA COMMANDE RHÉOLOGIQUE | [2019/13] |
Former [2018/23] | UREAURETHANES FOR RHEOLOGY CONTROL | ||
Former [2018/23] | URÉE-URÉTHANES POUR COMMANDE RHÉOLOGIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 26.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2016 | AL | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | DK | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | ES | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | HR | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | MK | 26.06.2019 | MT | 26.06.2019 | PL | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | RS | 26.06.2019 | SE | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | SM | 26.06.2019 | TR | 26.06.2019 | IE | 22.07.2019 | LU | 22.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | NO | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.07.2016 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 22.07.2016 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2002115882 (HAUBENNESTEL KARLHEINZ [DE], et al) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP2292675 (BYK CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-19* paragraphs [0015] - [0016] - [0031] , [0038] , [0046] , [0053] - [0055] - [0064]; example 5; claim - * | by applicant | DE2822908 | EP0006252 | DE19919482 | EP1188779 | DE10127290 | EP2292675 | EP2370489 |