EP3335118 - VIRTUALIZING GRAPHICS PROCESSING IN A PROVIDER NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazon Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 81226 Seattle, WA 98108-1226 / US | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILT, Nicholas Patrick 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 02 /
TAMBE, Ashutosh 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 03 /
BURNS, Nathan Lee 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 04 /
BSHARA, Nafea 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 16754082.2 | 10.08.2016 | [2018/25] | WO2016US46339 | Priority number, date | US201514822511 | 10.08.2015 Original published format: US201514822511 | [2018/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017027584 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3335118 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
G06F9/5044 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/5077 (EP,KR,US);
G09G5/003 (KR,US);
G06F9/5072 (EP,KR,US);
G06T1/20 (KR,US);
G06T1/60 (KR,US);
G09G2370/022 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Title | German: | VIRTUALISIERUNG VON GRAFIKVERARBEITUNG IN EINEM ANBIETERNETZWERK | [2018/25] | English: | VIRTUALIZING GRAPHICS PROCESSING IN A PROVIDER NETWORK | [2018/25] | French: | VIRTUALISATION DE TRAITEMENT GRAPHIQUE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE FOURNISSEUR | [2018/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 12.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/42] | 20.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2012154389 (BOHAN RONAN [IE], et al) [X] 1,3-13,15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004]; figures 1, 2, 3B * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052] * [I] 2,14; | [A]WO2014100558 (VMWARE INC [US]) [A] 2 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] *; | [A]US2014286390 (FEAR ANDREW [US]) [A] 1,5,10* paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2015116335 (CHEN PU [CN], et al) [A] 1,5,10 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020]; figure 1 *; | [A] - Jeff Luke Wignall Weiss, "Excerpt from: NVIDIA GRID(TM) VGPU(TM) DEPLOYMENT GUIDE FOR VMWARE HORIZON 6.1 - SP-07476-001_v04.3", NVIDIA Techpub, (20150301), pages i, ii, 1 - 12, URL: http://www.vmware.com/content/dam/digitalmarketing/vmware/en/pdf/products/horizon/grid-vgpu-deployment-guide.pdf, (20161103), XP055316297 [A] 2 * page 11 - page 12 * |