EP3263330 - ADHESIVE SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.02.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lintec of America, Inc. 15930 S. 48th Street, Suite 110 Phoenix, AR 85048 / US | For all designated states LINTEC Corporation 23-23 Hon-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OVALLE Raquel c/o LINTEC OF AMERICA INC. 15930 S. 48th Street, Suite 110 Phoenix, Arizona 85048 / US | 02 /
ITO Masaharu c/o LINTEC OF AMERICA INC. 15930 S. 48th Street, Suite 110 Phoenix, Arizona 85048 / US | 03 /
INOUE Kanzan c/o LINTEC OF AMERICA INC. 15930 S. 48th Street, Suite 110 Phoenix, Arizona 85048 / US | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/01] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 16755431.0 | 23.02.2016 | [2018/01] | WO2016JP55127 | Priority number, date | US201562119478P | 23.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562119478 P | US201562252908P | 09.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562252908 P | US201562258352P | 20.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562258352 P | [2018/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016136685 | Date: | 01.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3263330 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, B32B27/14 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
B32B9/007 (EP,US);
C09J7/21 (KR);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/14 (EP,US);
C09J11/04 (KR);
B32B2255/02 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,US);
B32B2262/106 (EP,US);
B32B2264/108 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/01] | B32B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Title | German: | KLEBEFOLIE | [2018/01] | English: | ADHESIVE SHEET | [2018/01] | French: | FEUILLE ADHÉSIVE | [2018/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2017 | Translation filed | 29.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 29.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012313499 (SON JUNG-HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,5,11 *[I] 1-12 | International search | [A]JP2008519122 (Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.) [A] 1-12* , entire text; all drawings & US 2009/0127712 A1 & WO 2006/048847 A1 & EP 1809716 A1 & KR 10-2007-0083948 A & CN 101094901 A *; | [A]JP2009280492 (UNIV QINGHUA, et al) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2009/0289203 A1 & CN 101585533 A *; | [A]JP2011132387 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings & WO 2011/077784 A1 *; | [A]JP2012214586 (LINTEC CORP) [A] 1-12 * , entire text (Family: none) * |