EP3347240 - HOOK ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jaguar Land Rover Limited Abbey Road Whitley Coventry, Warwickshire CV3 4LF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | For all designated states Jaguar Land Rover Limited Abbey Road Whitley Coventy, Warwickshire CV3 4LF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OAKLEY, Matthew Jaguar Land Rover Patents Department W/1/073 Abbey Road Whitley Coventry Warwickshire CV3 4LF / GB | 02 /
BROWN, Christopher Jaguar Land Rover Patents Department W/1/073 Abbey Road Whitley Coventry Warwickshire CV3 4LF / GB | 03 /
THORPE, Christopher Jaguar Land Rover Patents Department W/1/073 Abbey Road Whitley Coventry Warwickshire CV3 4LF / GB | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Westcott, Matthew John George Jaguar Land Rover Patents W/1/073 Abbey Road Whitley Coventry CV3 4LF / GB | [2018/29] | Application number, filing date | 16756980.5 | 12.08.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016EP69257 | Priority number, date | GB20150014357 | 13.08.2015 Original published format: GB 201514357 | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017025631 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3347240 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60R7/10, A47G25/06 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
B60R7/10 (EP,GB);
A47G25/06 (GB);
B60R7/08 (GB);
A47G25/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Title | German: | HAKENANORDNUNG | [2018/29] | English: | HOOK ASSEMBLY | [2018/29] | French: | ENSEMBLE CROCHET | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/29] | 14.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 14.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/09] | 22.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 05.06.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.06.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 05.06.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.06.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE9405306U (UTESCHENY ENDOS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,22 * the whole document *; | [XAI]EP1332920 (TRW INC [US]) [X] 1,4-9,11,13,22 * paragraphs [0007] - [0034]; figures 1-4 * [A] 12,14-17 [I] 2,3,10,18-21; | [X]JP2003325267 (PIOLAX INC) [X] 1,6,22* figures 1-9 * |