EP3334443 - COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sigmoid Pharma Limited The Invent Centre Dublin City University Dublin 9 / IE | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COULTER, Ivan 25 Seamount Mount Merrion Co. Dublin Dublin / IE | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 16756985.4 | 12.08.2016 | [2018/25] | WO2016EP69290 | Priority number, date | GB20150014328 | 12.08.2015 Original published format: GB 201514328 | [2018/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017025638 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3334443 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/17, A61K39/395, A61K47/44, A61K38/13, A61K47/30, A61P29/00 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
A61K38/13 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/436 (KR);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K39/461 (EP,KR);
A61K39/4631 (EP,KR);
A61K39/4644 (EP,KR);
A61K9/107 (EP,US);
A61K9/1617 (US);
A61K9/1658 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/167 (US);
A61K9/5057 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (KR);
A61P29/00 (KR);
A61P37/06 (EP,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2018/25] | English: | COMPOSITIONS | [2018/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS | [2018/25] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 27.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 03.10.2018 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/13] | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007167358 (FEINERMAN GREGG [US], et al) [Y] 1-88 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] ** claims 1-20 *; | [IY]US2015132396 (COULTER IVAN [IE], et al) [I] 1-88 * the whole document * [Y] 1-88; | [Y]WO2015104414 (SIGMOID PHARMA LTD [IE]) [Y] 1-88 * abstract * * claims 1-130 * |