EP3338131 - MULTI-APERTURE IMAGING DEVICE HAVING CHANNEL-SPECIFIC ADJUSTABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2018/26] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIPPERMANN, Frank c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Angewandte Optik und Feinmechanik IOF Albert-Einstein-Str. 7 07745 Jena / DE | 02 /
BRÜCKNER, Andreas c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Angewandte Optik und Feinmechanik IOF Albert-Einstein-Str. 7 07745 Jena / DE | 03 /
BRÄUER, Andreas c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Angewandte Optik und Feinmechanik IOF Albert-Einstein-Str. 7 07745 Jena / DE | 04 /
OBERDÖRSTER, Alexander c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Angewandte Optik und Feinmechanik IOF Albert-Einstein-Str. 7 07745 Jena / DE | [2021/30] |
Former [2018/26] | 01 /
WIPPERMANN, Frank Berliner Str. 57 98617 Meiningen / DE | ||
02 /
BRÜCKNER, Andreas Dornburger Straße 83 07743 Jena / DE | |||
03 /
BRÄUER, Andreas Rabis 19 07646 Schlöben / DE | |||
04 /
OBERDÖRSTER, Alexander Karl-Liebknecht-Straße 6 07749 Jena / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | König, Andreas Rudolf Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16757207.2 | 18.08.2016 | [2018/26] | WO2016EP69653 | Priority number, date | DE201510215845 | 19.08.2015 Original published format: DE102015215845 | [2018/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017029380 | Date: | 23.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3338131 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3338131 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/00, G02B27/10, H04N5/225, H04N5/232, G02B26/08, G02B7/08, G02B27/64 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
G02B7/08 (EP,KR,US);
G02B13/001 (EP,KR,US);
G02B26/0816 (EP,KR,US);
G02B26/0875 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/646 (EP,KR,US);
G03B30/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIAPERTURABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT KANALINDIVIDUELLER EINSTELLBARKEIT | [2018/26] | English: | MULTI-APERTURE IMAGING DEVICE HAVING CHANNEL-SPECIFIC ADJUSTABILITY | [2018/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION À MULTIPLES OUVERTURES AVEC POSSIBILITÉ DE RÉGLAGE INDIVIDUEL DES CANAUX | [2018/26] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 05.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2016 | AL | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | ES | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | IT | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | MT | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | TR | 28.07.2021 | AT | 18.08.2021 | IE | 18.08.2021 | LU | 18.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 18.08.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
TR | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 18.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.08.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 18.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 18.08.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 18.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 18.08.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 18.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 18.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 18.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 18.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 18.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 18.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 18.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 18.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 28.07.2021 | |
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6992699 (VANCE SCOTT L [US], et al); | [Y]US2009122406 (ROUVINEN JARKKO [FI], et al); | [IA]US2014111650 (GEORGIEV TODOR G [US], et al); | [Y]DE102013209819 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [Y]WO2015015383 (COREPHOTONICS LTD [IL]); | [I]US2015109468 (LAROIA RAJIV [US]); | [Y]US2015201128 (DONG LEPING [CN]); | [A]US2015215607 (CHOU HONG-LONG [TW], et al); | [Y]DE102014213371 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); |