EP3265745 - LIGHTWEIGHT AMMUNITION BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastpack Defence ApS Thorsvej 6, st. 4100 Ringsted / DK | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGMANN, Jan Bendix Hvidovreskellet 51 2650 Hvidovre / DK | 02 /
DAHL, Jørgen Engelsborgvej 7 4173 Fjenneslev / DK | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Nordic Patent Service A/S Bredgade 30 1260 Copenhagen K / DK | [2018/02] | Application number, filing date | 16758500.9 | 02.03.2016 | [2018/02] | WO2016DK50060 | Priority number, date | DK20150000133 | 04.03.2015 Original published format: DK 201500133 | [2018/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016138909 | Date: | 09.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3265745 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 09.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F42B39/26, F42B39/00, B65D43/16 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
F42B39/26 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B65D1/24 (IL,KR);
B65D11/10 (IL,KR);
B65D11/20 (IL,KR);
B65D43/0204 (IL,KR);
B65D43/166 (EP,IL,US);
B65D43/167 (EP,IL,US);
B65D45/16 (IL,KR);
B65D81/18 (IL,KR);
|
Former IPC [2018/02] | F42B39/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Title | German: | LEICHTER MUNITIONSKASTEN | [2018/02] | English: | LIGHTWEIGHT AMMUNITION BOX | [2018/02] | French: | BOÎTE DE MUNITIONS LÉGÈRE | [2018/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 04.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 27.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/10] | Divisional application(s) | EP18154679.7 / EP3346226 | EP18154682.1 / EP3346227 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2019 | 31.03.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO9318975 (BUCKHORN MATERIAL HANDLING [US]) [I] 1,9,10 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 23 * * page 7, line 15 - line 25 * [A] 2-8,11,12; | [IA]JPH0644750U (HOSHINO NORIO) [I] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011]; figure 3 * [A] 2-8,11,12; | [X]KR101425670B (POONGSAN CORP [KR]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0018] , [0031] - [0032] - [0042] - [0045]; figures 2,3,4,5,6,8,11-13 *; | [A]KR20140111838 (INNOBIZ CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0020] , [0028] , [0043]; figures 2,3 * | International search | [A]GB722347 (GEORGE BLAGDON) [A] 1-38 * , see whole document *; | [A]US3593873 (VONK JOHNNY) [A] 1-38 * , see whole document *; | [A]EP0047862 (STREUBER SULO EISENWERK F [DE]) [A] 1-38 * , see whole document *; | [A]US2004055922 (ORDONEZ JOSE L [US]) [A] 1-38 * , see whole document *; | [A]WO2007070029 (LINPAC MATERIALS HANDLING [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * , see whole document *; | [A]US2010077813 (ZHANG NINGSHENG [US], et al) [A] 1-38* , paragraphs (0032), (0038); figures 5, 7 *; | [A]JP2011040324 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC) [A] 1-38 * , see figures and English abstract * | by applicant | EP0047862 | KR101425670B |