EP3267254 - PHOTOSENSITIVE RESIN COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CURED RESIN FILM, AND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARIMOTO, Yukari c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
MASUDA, Yuki c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
OKUDA, Ryoji c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2018/02] | Application number, filing date | 16758719.5 | 09.02.2016 | [2018/02] | WO2016JP53765 | Priority number, date | JP20150042030 | 04.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015042030 | [2018/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016140024 | Date: | 09.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3267254 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/004, C08G73/10, C08G73/22, G03F7/023, G03F7/075, G03F7/16, G03F7/022 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
G03F7/0046 (EP,US);
G03F7/004 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0387 (US);
C08F8/00 (US);
C08G73/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08G73/1039 (US);
C08G73/1042 (US);
C08G73/1053 (US);
C08G73/106 (US);
C08G73/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08G8/12 (US);
G03F7/0226 (US);
G03F7/023 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0233 (US);
G03F7/0236 (US);
G03F7/038 (US);
G03F7/039 (US);
G03F7/075 (EP,US);
G03F7/0755 (EP,US);
G03F7/0757 (US);
G03F7/161 (EP,US);
G03F7/162 (US);
G03F7/168 (KR,US);
G03F7/2004 (US);
G03F7/322 (US);
G03F7/40 (KR,US);
H01L24/02 (US);
H01L2224/02311 (US);
H01L2224/02379 (US);
H01L2224/024 (US);
H01L2924/07025 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/02] | G03F7/004, C08G73/10, C08G73/22, G03F7/023, G03F7/075 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Title | German: | LICHTEMPFINDLICHE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEHÄRTETEN HARZFILMS UND HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2018/02] | English: | PHOTOSENSITIVE RESIN COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CURED RESIN FILM, AND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2018/02] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE PHOTOSENSIBLE, PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER UN FILM DURCI DE RÉSINE ET DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2018/02] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2017 | Translation filed | 09.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 09.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/04] | 21.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1909142 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0011] , [0012] , [0028] , [0054] , [0104] , [0139] - [0145] - [0217]; claims 1-7 * [Y] 3,4; | [XY]JP2010128011 (HITACHI CHEM DUPONT MICROSYS) [X] 1,2,5-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0054] - [0059] - [0093] , [0094]; claims 1-9 * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]WO2014175316 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0159] - [0167] *; | [Y]WO2014199800 (JSR CORP [JP]) [Y] 3,4* paragraph [0142]; compounds C-1-1-1 * | International search | [XY]JP2008058839 (ASAHI KASEI DENSHI KK) [X] 1-2, 4-16 * , claims; paragraphs [0151] to [0155]; examples 4, 13 (Family: none) * [Y] 3; | [XYA]WO2010001780 (ASAHI KASEI E MATERIALS CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-2, 5-16 * , claims; example 42 & JP 5498382 B & CN 102076740 A & KR 10-2011-0016456 A & TW 201005008 A * [Y] 3 [A] 4; | [A]WO2012002134 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * , entire text & US 2013/0214379 A1 full text & WO 2012/002134 A & EP 2590025 A1 & CN 102985877 A & KR 10-2013-0016375 A & SG 186462 A *; | [XY]JP2012027490 (ASAHI KASEI E-MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-2, 4-16 * , claims; examples 1 to 34 & JP 4878662 B & WO 2011/135887 A1 & CN 102439520 A & KR 10-2012-0022712 A & TW 201144383 A * [Y] 3; | [Y]WO2014199800 (JSR CORP [JP]) [Y] 3 * , paragraph [0142] (Family: none) *; | [EX]JP2016045220 (TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO LTD) [EX] 1-2, 4-6, 8, 11-12* , claims; examples 3 to 4, 7 to 8 (Family: none) * |