EP3249861 - DEVICE FOR COLLECTING COMMUNICATION DESTINATION CORRESPONDENCE RELATION,METHOD FOR COLLECTING COMMUNICATION DESTINATION CORRESPONDENCE RELATION, ANDPROGRAM FOR COLLECTING COMMUNICATION DESTINATION CORRESPONDENCE RELATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIBA, Daiki c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
YAGI, Takeshi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/48] | Application number, filing date | 16758731.0 | 12.02.2016 | [2017/48] | WO2016JP54101 | Priority number, date | JP20150043941 | 05.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015043941 | [2017/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016140037 | Date: | 09.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3249861 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3249861 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F21/56, // H04L29/12 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
H04L63/1425 (EP,US);
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
G06F21/56 (EP,US);
H04L61/5007 (US);
H04L63/145 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/48] | H04L12/70, G06F21/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SAMMELN VON KOMMUNIKATIONSZIELKORRESPONDENZBEZUG, VERFAHREN ZUM SAMMELN VON KOMMUNIKATIONSZIELKORRESPONDENZBEZUG UND PROGRAMM ZUM SAMMELN VON KOMMUNIKATIONSZIELKORRESPONDENZBEZUG | [2017/48] | English: | DEVICE FOR COLLECTING COMMUNICATION DESTINATION CORRESPONDENCE RELATION,METHOD FOR COLLECTING COMMUNICATION DESTINATION CORRESPONDENCE RELATION, ANDPROGRAM FOR COLLECTING COMMUNICATION DESTINATION CORRESPONDENCE RELATION | [2017/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR COLLECTER UNE RELATION DE CORRESPONDANCE DE DESTINATION DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉ POUR COLLECTER UNE RELATION DE CORRESPONDANCE DE DESTINATION DE COMMUNICATION, ET PROGRAMME POUR COLLECTER UNE RELATION DE CORRESPONDANCE DE DESTINATION DE COMMUNICATION | [2017/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2017 | Translation filed | 21.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 21.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2016 | AL | 19.12.2018 | AT | 19.12.2018 | CY | 19.12.2018 | CZ | 19.12.2018 | DK | 19.12.2018 | EE | 19.12.2018 | ES | 19.12.2018 | FI | 19.12.2018 | HR | 19.12.2018 | IT | 19.12.2018 | LT | 19.12.2018 | LV | 19.12.2018 | MC | 19.12.2018 | MK | 19.12.2018 | NL | 19.12.2018 | PL | 19.12.2018 | RO | 19.12.2018 | RS | 19.12.2018 | SE | 19.12.2018 | SI | 19.12.2018 | SK | 19.12.2018 | SM | 19.12.2018 | TR | 19.12.2018 | IE | 12.02.2019 | LU | 12.02.2019 | MT | 12.02.2019 | FR | 19.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | BG | 19.03.2019 | NO | 19.03.2019 | GR | 20.03.2019 | IS | 19.04.2019 | PT | 19.04.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.02.2016 | |
AL | 19.12.2018 | ||
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IE | 12.02.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2019 | ||
MT | 12.02.2019 | ||
FR | 19.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IE | 12.02.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2019 | ||
MT | 12.02.2019 | ||
FR | 19.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IE | 12.02.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2019 | ||
MT | 12.02.2019 | ||
FR | 19.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IE | 12.02.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2019 | ||
FR | 19.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
IE | 12.02.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2019 | ||
FR | 19.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
IE | 12.02.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 12.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 12.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 12.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 19.12.2018 | |
NO | 19.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009155453 (VERISIGN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 23] - [0031] - [0 51] - [0056]; figure 4 *; | [I]US8347394 (LEE ANDREW [US]) [I] 1-8 * columns 2, 4-7 *; | [A] - Florian Weimer, "Passive DNS Replication", 17th Annual FIRST Conference on Computer Security, Singapore, (20050629), pages 1 - 13, URL: http://www.enyo.de/fw/software/dnslogger/first2005-paper.pdf, (20140314), XP055107805 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [YA]JP2004274652 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-2, 4, 6-8 * , paragraphs [0034], [0042] to [0051]; fig. 5, 9 to 12 (Family: none) *[A] 3, 5; | [YA]JP2010161499 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 1-2, 4, 6-8 * , paragraphs [0030] to [0037], [0088] to [0091], [0105] to [0112]; fig. 1 to 2, 10, 12 to 14 (Family: none) * [A] 3, 5 |