EP3266875 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING GLUTATHIONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Kobe University 1-1, Rokkodai-cho Nada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 657-8501 / JP | [2021/21] |
Former [2018/02] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | ||
For all designated states National University Corporation Kobe University 1-1 Rokkodai-cho Nada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 657-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARA, Kiyotaka c/o National University Corporation Kobe University 1-1 Rokkodai-cho Nada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 657-8501 / JP | 02 /
KONDO, Akihiko c/o National University Corporation Kobe University 1-1 Rokkodai-cho Nada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 657-8501 / JP | 03 /
IWASAKI, Akira c/o Kanka Corporation 1-8 Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | 04 /
IWAMOTO, Yuichi c/o Kanka Corporation 1-8 Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/02] | Application number, filing date | 16759041.3 | 04.03.2016 | [2018/02] | WO2016JP56845 | Priority number, date | JP20150042909 | 04.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015042909 | [2018/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016140349 | Date: | 09.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3266875 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/02, C12N1/19, C12N15/09 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
C12P21/02 (EP,US);
C12N15/81 (US);
C12N9/0051 (US);
C12N9/93 (EP,US);
C12Y108/01007 (EP,US);
C12Y108/03002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GLUTATHION | [2018/02] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING GLUTATHIONE | [2018/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE GLUTATHION | [2018/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2017 | Translation filed | 19.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 19.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/48] | 27.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2695890 (KYOWA HAKKO BIO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 11 * abstract *; | [X] - PEREIRA-RODRIGUES ET AL, "Electrocatalytic activity of cobalt phthalocyanine CoPc adsorbed on a graphite electrode for the oxidation of reduced l-glutathione (GSH) and the reduction of its disulfide (GSSG) at physiological pH", BIOELECTROCHEMI, ELESEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20061222), vol. 70, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BIOELECHEM.2006.03.025, ISSN 1567-5394, pages 147 - 154, XP005825065 [X] 11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bioelechem.2006.03.025 | [X] - DEPONTE MARCEL ED - LILLIG C H ET AL, "Glutathione catalysis and the reaction mechanisms of glutathione-dependent enzymes", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - GENERAL SUBJECTS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20121002), vol. 1830, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.BBAGEN.2012.09.018, ISSN 0304-4165, pages 3217 - 3266, XP028529791 [X] 11 * figures 1b-d * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbagen.2012.09.018 | [XP] - HARA KIYOTAKA Y ET AL, "Improvement of oxidized glutathione fermentation by thiol redox metabolism engineering inSaccharomyces cerevisiae", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, DE, vol. 99, no. 22, doi:10.1007/S00253-015-6847-Z, ISSN 0175-7598, (20150804), pages 9771 - 9778, (20150804), XP036118713 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-015-6847-z | [T] - JYUMPEI KOBAYASHI ET AL, "Enzymatic improvement of mitochondrial thiol oxidase Erv1 for oxidized glutathione fermentation by Saccharomyces cerevisiae", MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, (20170315), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s12934-017-0658-0, XP055482618 [T] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s12934-017-0658-0 | International search | [A]WO2009057813 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* , entire text & JP 5288379 B & US 2011/0014651 A1 & EP 2210940 A1 & ES 2537806 T *; | [A]JP2012213376 (AJINOMOTO KK) [A] 1-14 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014064472 (KANEKA CORP, et al) [A] 1-14 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A] - KIRIYAMA KENTARO et al., "Oxidized glutathione fermentation using Saccharomyces cerevisiae engineered for glutathione metabolism.", Appl Microbiol Biotechnol, (20130703), vol. 97, pages 7399 - 7404, XP035328706 [A] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-013-5074-8 |