EP3266542 - MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR MAGNETIC FREEZING MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Santoku Corporation 14-34, Fukae-Kitamachi 4-chome Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 658-0013 / JP | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIKKAWA Takehiko c/o Santoku Corporation 14-34 Fukae-Kitamachi 4-chome Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 658-0013 / JP | 02 /
TAKATA Hiroaki c/o Santoku Corporation 14-34 Fukae-Kitamachi 4-chome Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 658-0013 / JP | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2018/02] | Application number, filing date | 16759042.1 | 04.03.2016 | [2018/02] | WO2016JP56847 | Priority number, date | JP20150060129 | 05.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015060129 | [2018/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016140350 | Date: | 09.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3266542 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/02, B22F9/04, B22F5/00, C22C38/00, C22C1/04, // C22C33/02 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
B22F5/00 (EP,US);
B22F3/14 (US);
B22F3/16 (US);
B22F3/24 (US);
C22C1/0441 (EP,US);
C22C1/0483 (EP,US);
C22C33/02 (EP,US);
C22C33/04 (US);
C22C38/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
F25B21/00 (EP,US);
H01F1/00 (EP,US);
H01F1/0306 (US);
H01F41/02 (US);
B22F2301/355 (US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
B22F9/04 (EP,US);
C22C2202/02 (EP,US);
C22C33/0257 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F1/10, B22F3/03, B22F3/1021, B22F3/10, B22F2003/248 (US);
B22F2998/10, B22F1/10, B22F3/20, B22F3/1021, B22F3/15, B22F2003/248 (US);
B22F2998/10, B22F1/10, B22F3/225, B22F3/1021, B22F3/12, B22F2003/248 (US);
B22F2999/00, B22F1/10, C22C1/0441, C22C1/0483, C22C2202/02 (US,EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F1/10, C22C2202/02, C22C1/0483, C22C1/0441 (US,EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F2003/248, B22F2201/013 (US,EP) (-) |
Former IPC [2020/15] | C22C38/02, B22F9/04 | ||
Former IPC [2018/45] | B22F3/00, C22C38/00, F25B21/00, H01F1/00, C22C38/04, B22F5/00, C22C1/04, C22C33/02 | ||
Former IPC [2018/02] | B22F3/00, C22C38/00, F25B21/00, H01F1/00, C22C38/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN MAGNETISCHES GEFRIERMODUL | [2018/02] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR MAGNETIC FREEZING MODULE | [2018/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MODULE DE CONGÉLATION MAGNÉTIQUE | [2018/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2017 | Translation filed | 08.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 08.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 06.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2005113209 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 8-12,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] , [0008] , [0011]; example 1 * [Y] 1-7,13; | [Y]US2014023821 (KWON SOON-JAE [KR], et al) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0018] , [0026] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0056] - [0058] - [0063] , [0067] *; | [Y]EP2804187 (CHINESE ACAD PHYSICS INST [CN], et al) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * examples 7,9 *; | [A]US2015037558 (DUBREZ ALEXANDRA [SE], et al) [A] 13* paragraphs [0160] - [0169]; claims 1-14 *; | [T] - LU ZHIBIN ET AL, "Correlation between average melting temperature and glass transition temperature in metallic glasses", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, A I P PUBLISHING LLC, US, (20090212), vol. 94, no. 6, doi:10.1063/1.3081028, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 61913 - 61913, XP012118966 [T] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3081028 | [Y] - MAYER CHARLOTTE ET AL, "Large scale PM process for producing magnetocaloric heat exchanger", EUROPEAN CONGRESS AND EXHIBITION ON POWDER METALLURGY. EUROPEAN PM CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS - EURO PM2015 PROCEEDINGS: PM FOR CURRENT AND FUTURE APPLICATIONS, FRANCE, 4-7 OCTOBER 2015 / [ORGANISED AND SPONSORED BY EUROPEAN POWDER METALLURGY ASSOCIATION, (20150101), pages 1 - 6, XP009508302 [Y] 13 * the whole document * * page 4 - page 5; figures 4-6 * | International search | [A]JP2007031831 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [A] 1-8* , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014095486 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-8 * , & US 2014/0127071 A1 & CN 103801690 A * |