EP3328358 - CONCENTRATE CONTAINING ALPROSTADIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebro Holding GmbH Bahnhofbichl 13 6391 Fieberbrunn / AT | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESSE, Ernst Reitliftweg 18 6391 Fieberbrunn / AT | 02 /
HANSBAUER, Bernhard Gemeindeweg 5 5061 Elsbethen-Glasenbach / AT | 03 /
HÄUSLER, Franz Gabelsbergerstrasse 1 83435 Bad Reichenhall / DE | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Patentanwälte OG Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2018/23] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 16759666.7 | 25.07.2016 | [2018/23] | WO2016AT60020 | Priority number, date | AT20150050666 | 27.07.2015 Original published format: AT 506662015 | [2018/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017015692 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3328358 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3328358 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5575, A61K9/00, A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K9/08, A61P9/00 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,AT);
A61K31/5575 (EP,AT);
A61K47/10 (EP,AT);
A61K47/12 (EP);
A61K9/08 (EP,AT)
|
Former IPC [2018/23] | A61K9/00, A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K9/08, A61K31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONZENTRAT ENTHALTEND ALPROSTADIL | [2018/23] | English: | CONCENTRATE CONTAINING ALPROSTADIL | [2018/23] | French: | CONCENTRÉ CONTENANT DE L'ALPROSTADIL | [2018/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 31.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.11.2022 | CZ | 23.11.2022 | DK | 23.11.2022 | ES | 23.11.2022 | FI | 23.11.2022 | HR | 23.11.2022 | IT | 23.11.2022 | LT | 23.11.2022 | LV | 23.11.2022 | MC | 23.11.2022 | NL | 23.11.2022 | PL | 23.11.2022 | RS | 23.11.2022 | SE | 23.11.2022 | SI | 23.11.2022 | SK | 23.11.2022 | SM | 23.11.2022 | NO | 23.02.2023 | GR | 24.02.2023 | IS | 23.03.2023 | PT | 23.03.2023 | GB | 25.07.2023 | IE | 25.07.2023 | LU | 25.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | FR | 31.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
IT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
GB | 25.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
GB | 25.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | ES | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | ES | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 23.11.2022 | |
NO | 23.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0407148 (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,14-16,18,19,24,30,31 * page 2, paragraph 1; examples 1-2 *; | [X]WO9511683 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-11,15,16,18,19,27,31 * claims 1-10 *; | [XI]CN102048687 (NORTH CHINA PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP CORP) [X] 1-4,7-9,18,27,30,31 * the whole document *[I] 6,12,13,17,20-23,25,26,28,29 |