EP3279204 - METHOD FOR PREPARING FOUR-COORDINATED ORGANIC BORON COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Chemical Technology 141, Gajeong-ro Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 34114 / KR | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Kee In 113-305 57 Eoeun-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34140 / KR | 02 /
SADU, Venkata Subbaiah 141 Gajeong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34114 / KR | 03 /
HWANG, In Taek 133-606 57 Eoeun-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34140 / KR | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2018/06] | Application number, filing date | 16761993.1 | 10.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016KR02375 | Priority number, date | KR20150033383 | 10.03.2015 Original published format: KR 20150033383 | [2018/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016144106 | Date: | 15.09.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3279204 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
C07F5/025 (EP,KR,US);
C07F5/02 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
H10K85/30 (US);
C09K2211/1029 (US);
C09K2211/1033 (US);
C09K2211/1037 (US);
C09K2211/1044 (US);
C09K2211/1088 (US);
C09K2211/1092 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 4-KOORDINIERTEN ORGANISCHEN BORVERBINDUNG | [2018/06] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING FOUR-COORDINATED ORGANIC BORON COMPOUND | [2018/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSÉ DE BORE ORGANIQUE À QUATRE COORDINATIONS | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2017 | Translation filed | 04.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 04.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | 24.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2005123095 (ANACOR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | International search | [AX]US2005070503 (LEE VING [US], et al); | [AX]JP2008502694 ; | [AX]JP2008502702 ; | [A]KR20120023810 (UNIVERSAL DISPLAY CORP [US]) |