EP3268028 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rush University Medical Center 1653 W. Congress Parkway Chicago, IL 60612 / US | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAHAN, Kalipada 7830 Tripp Avenue Skokie, IL 60076 / US | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/03] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 16762206.7 | 04.03.2016 | [2018/03] | WO2016US20864 | Priority number, date | US201562131343P | 11.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562131343 P | [2018/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016144743 | Date: | 15.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3268028 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/20, A61K39/395, C07K14/54 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
C07K16/244 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/3069 (US);
C07K2317/73 (US);
C07K2317/76 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2018/03] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING CANCER | [2018/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN CANCER | [2018/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 13.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2021 | Observations by third parties | 06.10.2021 | Observations by third parties | 07.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004081190 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al); | International search | [XY]US8080247 (GILES-KOMAR JILL [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 4-5, 9-10, 12-16 * ; column 4, lines 20-25; column 5 lines 1-19, and 24-25; column 6, lines 19-27; column 7, lines 8-10; column 20, lines 4-6 and 17-20; column 27, lines 1-7; column 38, lines 21-25; column 43, lines 48-50; column 45, lines 44-46; Column 53, lines 21-22, 26-27, and 31-32; column 56, lines 36-42; column * [Y] 3, 6-8, 17-18; | [Y]US2014314710 (PAHAN KALIPADA [US]) [Y] 3 * ; paragraphs [0009], [0031] *; | [Y] - DASGUPTA, S et al., "Generation of Functional Blocking Monoclonal Antibodies Against Mous Interleukin-12 p40 Homodimer and Monomer", Hybidoma, (20080000), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 141 - 151, XP002717612 [Y] 6 * ; page 147, first column, first paragraph; page 148, first column, first paragraph; page 149, second column, second paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hyb.2007.0560 | [Y] - HECKEL, MC et al., "Human Breast Tumor Cells Express IL -10 and IL -12P40 Transcripts and Proteins, But do not Produce IL -12P70", Cellular Immunology, (20110000), vol. 266, no. 2, pages 143 - 153, XP027554665 [Y] 7-8, 17-18 * (Abstract); Abstract * | [A] - WHEELER, RD et al., "Elevated Interferon Gamma Expression in the Central Nervous System Tumour Necrosis Factor Receptor 1-Deficient Mice with Experimental Autimmune Encephalomyelitis", Immunology, (20060000), vol. 118, pages 527 - 538, XP055309012 [A] 3 * ; page 527, second column, paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2567.2006.02395.x | [A] - ABDI K et al., "Free IL -12p40 Monomer is a Polyfunctional Adapter for Generating Novel IL -12-Like Hoterodimers Extracellularly", J Immunol., (20140615), vol. 192, no. 12, pages 6028 - 6036 [A] 11 * ; page 7, second paragraph * | [A] - HAMZA, T et al., "Interleukin 12 a Key Immunoregulatory Cytokine in Infection Applications", International Journal of Molecular Sciences, (20100000), vol. 11, pages 789 - 806, XP055309016 [A] 11 * ; page 790, fifth paragraph; page 791, first paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms11030789 | other | US2018194837 | - Dasgupta S, Bandopadhyay M, Pahan K., "Generation of functional blocking monoclonal antibodies against mouse interleukin-12 p40 homodimer and monomer", Hybridoma, Mary Ann Liebert, Inc. Publishers, US, US, (20080626), vol. 27, no. 3, doi:10.1089/hyb.2007.0560, ISSN 1554-0014, pages 141 - 151, XP002717612 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hyb.2007.0560 |