EP3268445 - AN OIL AND GAS TREATMENT COMPOSITION COMPRISING HYDROXYETHYL CELLULOSE AND CROSSLINKED POLYVINYLPYRROLIDONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hercules LLC 500 Hercules Road Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELBOUCI, Mohand 134 Shinn Circle Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | 02 /
WANG, Janice Jianzhao 59 Westwoods Boulevard Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/03] | Application number, filing date | 16762385.9 | 09.03.2016 | [2018/03] | WO2016US21468 | Priority number, date | US201562132028P | 12.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562132028 P | [2018/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016145020 | Date: | 15.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3268445 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/10, C09K8/20, C09K8/24 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
C09K8/20 (EP,US);
C09K2208/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] | Title | German: | ÖL UND GASBEHANDLUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HYDROXYETHYLCELLULOSE UND VERNETZTEM POLYVINYLPYRROLIDON | [2018/03] | English: | AN OIL AND GAS TREATMENT COMPOSITION COMPRISING HYDROXYETHYL CELLULOSE AND CROSSLINKED POLYVINYLPYRROLIDONE | [2018/03] | French: | COMPOSITION DE TRAITEMENT DE PÉTROLE ET DE GAZ COMPRENANT DE L'HYDROXYÉTHYL CELLULOSE ET DE LA POLYVINYLPYRROLIDONE RÉTICULÉE | [2018/03] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 19.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/13] | 21.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3132693 (FREDERICK WEISEND CHARLES) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 5-10; claim 1 * * column 4, line 10 - column 7, line 45 *; | [A]US4299710 (DUPRE JEAN, et al) [A] 1-14* column 1, line 4 - column 2, line 54; example 1; claims 1,2 *; | [AD]GB2267921 (BRANKLING DAVID [GB]) [AD] 1-14 * page 1, lines 29-33; claims 1,6,11 * * page 3, lines 15-52 *; | [Y]US7087554 (YOUNGSON ARTHUR [GB], et al) [Y] 1-14 * example 4; claims 1,4,6,7; compound 27 *; | [AD]US2007015670 (HARROWER ELAINE [GB], et al) [AD] 1-14 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019]; example 1; claims 10,13 *; | [Y] - J. SHEU, "Design and Synthesis of Shale Stabilizing Polymers for Water-Based Drilling Fluids", JOURNAL OF PETROLEUM SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, NL, (19881005), vol. 178, ISSN 0920-4105, pages 163 - 377, XP055484546 [Y] 1-14 * page 166 - page 167 * | International search | [A]US4792412 (HEILWEIL ISRAEL J [US]) [A] 1-4, 13-15, 18-20 * entire document *; | [A]US5291949 (DOVAN HOAI T [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 13-15, 18-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US6620769 (JUPPE HERBERT L [US], et al) [Y] 13-15 * entire document *; | [Y]US7087554 (YOUNGSON ARTHUR [GB], et al) [Y] 1-4, 13-15, 18-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US8258085 (MELBOUCI MOHAND [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 13-15, 18-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2013102588 (WU YUXIA [CN], et al) [A] 1-4, 13-15, 18-20* entire document * | by applicant | US4142595 | US4605068 | US4664818 | US4670501 | US4772646 | US4876017 | US5037930 | US5045219 | US5197544 | GB2267921 | US5362783 | US5728653 | US5771971 | US5908814 | US6247543 | US2002155956 | US6484821 | US6544933 | US6548579 | US2003106718 | US6609578 | US6620769 | WO2006013595 | WO2006013597 | WO2006013596 | US7087554 | US7091159 | US7549474 | US7833945 | US8258085 | - A. V. REIS et al., J. Org. Chem., (20090000), vol. 74, pages 3750 - 3757 | - S. H. KIM et al., Carbohydrate Polymers, (19930000), vol. 40, pages 180 - 190 | - FHILYPE J. et al., International Journal of Pharmaceutics, (20080000), vol. 355, pages 184 - 194 | - J. J. SHEUJ. PET, Sci. Eng., (19880000), vol. 178, pages 163 - 377 | - T. E. FURIA, CRC Handbook of Food Additives, (19720000), pages 271 - 294 | - Encyclopedia of Food Science, (19780000), pages 694 - 699 |