EP3344228 - COLOURED SURFACTANT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cosmetic Warriors Limited 29 High Street Poole Dorset BH15 1AB / GB | [2024/19] |
Former [2018/28] | For all designated states Cosmetic Warriors Limited 18-20 Market Street Poole, Dorset BH15 1NF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONSTANTINE, Mark 24 Constitution Hill Road Poole Dorset BH14 0QD / GB | 02 /
CONSTANTINE, Margaret Joan 24 Constitution Hill Road Poole Dorset BH14 0QD / GB | 03 /
AMBROSEN, Helen Elizabeth Poole Dorset BH15 1AB / GB | 04 /
BIRD, Rowena Jacqueline 171 Mudeford Christchurch Dorset BH23 4AG / GB | [2024/18] |
Former [2018/28] | 01 /
CONSTANTINE, Mark 24 Constitution Hill Road Poole Dorset BH14 0QD / GB | ||
02 /
CONSTANTINE, Margaret Joan 24 Constitution Hill Road Poole Dorset BH14 0QD / GB | |||
03 /
AMBROSEN, Helen Elizabeth 29 Tarrant Close Wimborne Dorset BH21 2FB / GB | |||
04 /
BIRD, Rowena Jacqueline 171 Mudeford Christchurch Dorset BH23 4AG / GB | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [2024/19] |
Former [2018/28] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 16763077.1 | 02.09.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016GB52709 | Priority number, date | GB20150015734 | 04.09.2015 Original published format: GB 201515734 | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017037464 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3344228 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3344228 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/46, A61Q19/10, A61K8/92, A61K8/02 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
A61K8/922 (EP,GB,US);
A61K8/40 (GB);
A61K8/0216 (EP,US);
A61K8/022 (EP,US);
A61K8/04 (US);
A61K8/19 (US);
A61K8/25 (GB);
A61K8/411 (GB);
A61K8/416 (US);
A61K8/42 (GB,US);
A61K8/463 (US);
A61K8/466 (EP,GB,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,GB,US);
A61K2800/31 (EP,US);
A61K2800/42 (EP,US);
A61K2800/43 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FARBIGE TENSIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2018/28] | English: | COLOURED SURFACTANT COMPOSITION | [2018/28] | French: | COMPOSITION DE TENSIOACTIF COLORÉE | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 31.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0312668 (CHRY SARL [FR]) [A] 1-33 * claim - *; | [A]JPH0374321 (TSUMURA & CO) [A] 1-33 * claim - *; | [X]US2003003069 (CARSON JOHN C [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,18 * examples 12-17 * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0047] *; | [X]US6551603 (VINSKI PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,11-13,18 * column 1, line 40 - line 47 * * column 2, line 6 - line 15 * * column 3, line 21 - line 29 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 12 * * tables I, II *; | [Y]US2003170301 (WEHLING FRED [US]) [Y] 1-33 * example C2 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0039] * * claim - *; | [A]WO2010094975 (COSMETIC WARRIORS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-33 * page 2, line 1 - line 17 * * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 3 * * page 6, line 32 - page 7, line 15 * * example -; claim - *; | [XY]JP2014109003 (KAO CORP) [X] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0022] * * example - * [Y] 1-33; | [A]WO2015014667 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-33* example -; claim - * |