EP3414933 - SIGNALING FOR ENHANCED MEASUREMENT GAP FOR SYNCHRONOUS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YIU, Candy 1750 SW Broadway Drive Portland, Oregon 97201 / US | 02 /
TANG, Yang 5752 Owens Drive Apt. 301 Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | 03 /
HUANG, Rui 8F Raycom A No. 2 Kexueyuan South Road Beijing 11 100085 / CN | 04 /
HEO, Youn Hyoung 4F 27-3 Hana Daetoo Securities Bldg. Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 11 150-705 / KR | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Froud, Christopher Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/32] | Barnfather, Karl Jon Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2018/51] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16763178.7 | 31.08.2016 | [2018/51] | WO2016US49742 | Priority number, date | US201662294862P | 12.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662294862 P | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017138985 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3414933 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3414933 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04L5/00 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGNALISIERUNG FÜR VERBESSERTE MESSLÜCKE FÜR SYNCHRONES NETZWERK | [2018/51] | English: | SIGNALING FOR ENHANCED MEASUREMENT GAP FOR SYNCHRONOUS NETWORK | [2018/51] | French: | SIGNALISATION POUR INTERVALLE DE MESURE AMÉLIORÉ POUR RÉSEAU SYNCHRONE | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 11.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | LU | 31.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
LU | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
LU | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
LU | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
LU | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2014341192 (VENKOB SATISH [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-21,23-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0046] - [0053] - [0072] , [0090] , [0091] , [0098] , [0101] - [0106] - [0130] - [0134] - [0143] , [0171] , [0172] , [0017] * * Apendix F, G *; | [XI] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Motivation for new WI: measurement gap enhancement", vol. RAN WG4, no. St. Julian's, Malta; 20160215 - 20160219, (20160208), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-160169, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG4_Radio/TSGR4_78/Docs/, (20160208), XP051067638 [X] 1,4,8,9,12,18-20 * the whole document * [I] 7,11,15,17,25 | [I] - INTEL CORPORATION, "TP for TR 36.894: Proposals on measurement gap enhancement", vol. RAN WG4, no. Anaheim, US; 20151116 - 20151120, (20151120), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-158176, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG4_Radio/TSGR4_77/Docs/, (20151120), XP051029239 [I] 1,4,5,7,9-12,15,17-20,22,25 * chapters 5.1, 5.2, 5.3.1, 6.1, 6.3.1, 6.4 * |