EP3347532 - SHROUD RETENTION SYSTEM FOR A WORK TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, IL 61629 / US | [2022/01] |
Former [2018/29] | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, IL 61629 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BJERKE, Nathan R. 1600 West Blue Sage Drive Apt. 3306 Peoria, IL 61615 / US | 02 /
CONGDON, Thomas M. 5413 West Legion Hall Road Dunlap, IL 61525 / US | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [2022/01] |
Former [2018/29] | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16763420.3 | 29.08.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016US49267 | Priority number, date | US201562216501P | 10.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562216501 P | US201615143916 | 02.05.2016 Original published format: US201615143916 | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017044336 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3347532 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3347532 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/28 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
E02F9/2841 (EP,US);
E02F9/2816 (US);
E02F3/40 (US);
E02F9/2825 (US);
E02F9/2883 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABDECKUNGSHALTESYSTEM FÜR EIN ARBEITSWERKZEUG | [2018/29] | English: | SHROUD RETENTION SYSTEM FOR A WORK TOOL | [2018/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RETENUE DE CARÉNAGE POUR OUTIL DE TRAVAIL | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 26.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2016 | AL | 05.01.2022 | AT | 05.01.2022 | CY | 05.01.2022 | CZ | 05.01.2022 | DK | 05.01.2022 | EE | 05.01.2022 | ES | 05.01.2022 | FI | 05.01.2022 | HR | 05.01.2022 | LT | 05.01.2022 | LV | 05.01.2022 | MC | 05.01.2022 | MK | 05.01.2022 | NL | 05.01.2022 | PL | 05.01.2022 | RO | 05.01.2022 | RS | 05.01.2022 | SE | 05.01.2022 | SI | 05.01.2022 | SK | 05.01.2022 | SM | 05.01.2022 | BG | 05.04.2022 | NO | 05.04.2022 | GR | 06.04.2022 | IS | 05.05.2022 | PT | 05.05.2022 | IE | 29.08.2022 | LU | 29.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 29.08.2016 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.08.2016 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 05.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005229441 (MAHER PATRICK G [AU]) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]WO2012016251 (TROSZCZYNSKI KRZYSZTOF LUDWIK [ZA]) [X] 1,9 * figure - *; | [XA]WO2013122561 (BLACK CAT BLADES LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * page 4 - page 6; figure - * [A] 5-8; | [E]WO2016135360 (METALOGENIA RES & TECH S L [ES]) [E] 1-3,9* figure - * |