EP3272317 - STENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodman Co., Ltd. 5th Floor KDX Nagoya Sakae Building 4-5-3 Sakae Naka-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 460-0008 / JP | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Takaharu c/o LS Building 277-1, Idogane-cho Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0976 / JP | 02 /
NOMURA, Yumiko c/o LS Building 277-1, Idogane-cho Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0976 / JP | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2018/04] | Application number, filing date | 16764991.2 | 16.03.2016 | [2018/04] | WO2016JP58220 | Priority number, date | JP20150054221 | 18.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015054221 | [2018/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016148162 | Date: | 22.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3272317 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/848, A61F2/88 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
A61F2/915 (EP);
A61F2/89 (US);
A61F2/848 (US);
A61F2/86 (US);
A61F2/88 (US);
A61F2/95 (US);
A61F2/966 (EP);
A61F2002/826 (EP,US);
A61F2002/8483 (EP,US);
A61F2002/8486 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91575 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0014 (US);
A61F2220/0008 (US);
A61F2220/0016 (US);
A61F2230/0069 (US);
A61F2230/0091 (EP);
A61F2250/0029 (US);
A61F2250/0036 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Title | German: | STENT | [2018/04] | English: | STENT | [2018/04] | French: | ENDOPROTHÈSE | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2017 | Translation filed | 04.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 04.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004015228 (LOMBARDI SYLVIE [DE], et al); | [X]US2004254627 (THOMPSON PAUL J [US], et al); | [XY]US2005222668 (SCHAEFFER DARIN G [US], et al); | [X]US7462190 (LOMBARDI SYLVIE [DE]); | [Y]US2013144375 (GIASOLLI ROBERT M [US], et al) | International search | [XY]JP2004506477 (Angiomed GmbH & Co. Medizintechnik KG.) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0035] to [0037]; fig. 2 & US 2004/0015228 A1 paragraphs [0047] to [0049]; fig. 2 & WO 2002/015820 A2 & EP 1634546 A1 * [Y] 4-7; | [A]US2007067016 (JUNG JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1* , paragraph [0028]; fig. 2 to 3 & WO 2005/027789 A1 & EP 1667608 B1 *; | [Y]US2007129786 (BEACH BRADLEY [US], et al) [Y] 5-7 * , paragraph [0036]; fig. 1A & WO 2008/016626 A2 *; | [Y]JP2014531247 (W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.) [Y] 4, 6 * , paragraphs [0038] to [0043]; fig. 3 & US 2013/0073029 A1 paragraphs [0053] to [0058]; fig. 3 & WO 2013/040373 A1 & EP 2755563 A1 * |