EP3182487 - ELECTRODE WITH MULTILAYER STRUCTURE AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kyoung Ho Research Park LG Chem Ltd. 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Seok Koo Research Park LG Chem Ltd. 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Ju Ri Research Park LG Chem Ltd. 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
SONG, Jooyong Research Park LG Chem Ltd. 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Hye Youn Research Park LG Chem Ltd. 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16765139.7 | 07.01.2016 | [2017/25] | WO2016KR00125 | Priority number, date | KR20150036599 | 17.03.2015 Original published format: KR 20150036599 | [2017/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016148383 | Date: | 22.09.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3182487 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/13, H01M4/62, H01M4/04, H01M10/052, H01M2/10, H01G11/26, H01G11/38, H01G11/42, H01G11/70, H01M4/139, H01M4/36, // H01M4/131, H01M4/133, H01M4/1391, H01M4/1393, H01M4/02 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
H01M4/0404 (EP,US);
H01M4/624 (KR);
H01M4/13 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01G11/28 (EP,US);
H01G11/38 (EP,US);
H01G11/46 (EP,US);
H01G11/50 (EP,US);
H01G11/70 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M4/04 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/0416 (US);
H01M4/139 (EP,US);
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
H01M4/62 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/621 (KR);
H01M4/64 (US);
H01M50/20 (KR);
H01M50/202 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/10 (KR);
H01M2220/20 (KR,US);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/133 (EP,US);
H01M4/1391 (EP,US);
H01M4/1393 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/25] | H01M4/13, H01M4/62, H01M4/04, H01M10/052, H01M2/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODE MIT MEHRSCHICHTIGER STRUKTUR UND LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT | [2017/25] | English: | ELECTRODE WITH MULTILAYER STRUCTURE AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY HAVING SAME | [2017/25] | French: | ELECTRODE À STRUCTURE MULTICOUCHE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM DOTÉE DE CELLE-CI | [2017/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2017 | Translation filed | 13.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 13.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09320569 (RICOH KK) [X] 1,12* page 4, paragraph 0007 - page 12, paragraph 0035; table 1 *; | [XI]US2013224584 (SUNG NAK GI [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * page 1, paragraph 0009 - page 6, paragraph 0097 * [I] 3,6; | [XI]US2014287304 (NETZ ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * page 1, paragraph 0005 - page 5, paragraph 0056; figure 1 * [I] 3,6 | International search | [Y]KR20080021945 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 6 * See claims 1-2,6. *; | [A]JP2008258055 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-22* See claims 1-2. *; | [XY]KR20120124077 (LG CHEM. LTD.) [X] 1-5, 7-22 * See claims 1-2, 5-6, 10-12,14, 18, 20; paragraphs [0058], [0083]. * [Y] 6; | [A]KR20140137660 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-22 * See claims 1, 5. *; | [A]KR20140140976 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-22 * See claims 1,10. * |