EP3271847 - INTELLIGENT THERMAL VALIDATION & MONITORING SYSTEM WITH ASSET MANAGEMENT AND SELF DIAGNOSIS CAPABILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amphenol Thermometrics, Inc. 967 Windfall Road Saint Mary's, PA 15857-3397 / US | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLANTE, Dennis 4 Riverhurst Road Apartment 421 Billerica, Massachusetts 01821 / US | 02 /
KIES, Frank Lise-Meitner-Strasse 17 75334 Straubenhardt / DE | 03 /
CHOWDHURY, Himangshu Flat 105 Block 08 Rain Tree Park Kukatpally Hyderabad 500072 / IN | 04 /
LUEBCKE, Volker Wachtkopfstrasse 4 71665 Gundelbach / DE | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/04] | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 16765787.3 | 17.03.2016 | [2018/04] | WO2016US22966 | Priority number, date | IN2015DEL731 | 17.03.2015 Original published format: IN 731DE2015 | IN2015DEL1088 | 18.04.2015 Original published format: IN 1088DE2015 | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016149551 | Date: | 22.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3271847 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G05B19/418 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
G05B19/4184 (EP,US);
G05B2219/11 (US);
G05B2219/37431 (EP,US);
G05B2223/02 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/04] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES THERMISCHES VALIDIERUNG- UND ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM MIT ANLAGENVERWALTUNG UND SELBSTDIAGNOSEFÄHIGKEITEN | [2018/04] | English: | INTELLIGENT THERMAL VALIDATION & MONITORING SYSTEM WITH ASSET MANAGEMENT AND SELF DIAGNOSIS CAPABILITIES | [2018/04] | French: | SYSTÈME INTELLIGENT DE VALIDATION THERMIQUE ET DE SURVEILLANCE AVEC CAPACITÉS DE GESTION D'ACTIFS ET D'AUTODIAGNOSTIC | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 13.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/46] | 26.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9707443 (DORNAN RESEARCH & DEV LIMITED [IE], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 1,4 * * page 1, line 3 - page 29, line 32 * | [X] - Amphenol Advanced Sensors, "Kaye Validator User's manual", (20140701), URL: https://sisw.cz/cz/downloads/M4350E_K_080414-web.pdf, (20181001), XP055511294 [X] 1-16 * Chapters 1, 2 and 5 * | International search | [XY]US2006117377 (FRENKIEL MICHEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-18, 21-30 * , entire document, especially abstract and para [0017], [0033]-[0037], [0040]-[0044], [0051]-[0055], [0074]-[0075], [0078]-[0085], [0096]-[0107], [0111], Fig. 4, claims 10-11. * [Y] 19-20, 31-32; | [Y]US2012310397 (RATAUL BALBIR S [US]) [Y] 19-20, 31-32 * , entire document, especially abstract and para [0076], [0070] [0081], [0086]. *; | [A]US2013080293 (KHIN MAUNG BOB A [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2013321131 (TUCKER LAYNE D [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * , entire document. * |