EP3347387 - USE OF A SULPHUR OR PHOSPHOROUS-CONTAINING POLYMER AS A PROCESSING AID IN A POLYVINYL CHLORIDE POLYMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthomer (UK) Ltd. Central Road Temple Fields Harlow, Essex CM20 2BH / GB | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHABROL, Virginie 40 En Chaplerue 57000 Metz / FR | 02 /
MAY, Chris c/o Synthomer (UK) Limited Central Road Templefields Harlow Essex CM20 2BH / GB | 03 /
SHAW, Peter c/o Synthomer (UK) Limited Central Road Templefields Harlow Essex CM20 2BH / GB | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2022/14] |
Former [2018/29] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16766350.9 | 08.09.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016GB52770 | Priority number, date | GB20150016125 | 11.09.2015 Original published format: GB 201516125 | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017042561 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3347387 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3347387 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/12, C08F230/02, C08F265/04, C08F275/00, C08L27/06, C08F14/06, C08F228/02, C08F220/38, C08L33/06, C08L43/02, C08L41/00 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
C08L27/06 (EP);
C08F14/06 (EP);
C08F228/02 (EP);
C08F265/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F14/06, C08F2/44 (EP);
C08F265/06, C08F2/22 (EP);
C08L27/06, C08L31/04 (EP);
C08L27/06, C08L33/062 (EP);
C08L27/06, C08L33/14 (EP);
C08L27/06, C08L41/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES SULPHUR- ODER PHOSPHOR-ENTHALTENDES POLYMER ALS VERARBEITUNGSHILFSMITTEL IN EINER POLYVINYLCHLORIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2021/41] | English: | USE OF A SULPHUR OR PHOSPHOROUS-CONTAINING POLYMER AS A PROCESSING AID IN A POLYVINYL CHLORIDE POLYMER COMPOSITION | [2018/29] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN POLYMÈRE COMPRENANT DU SULFURE OU DU PHOSPHORE COMME AGENT D'AIDE À LA FABRICATION D'UN POLYMÈRE DE CHLORURE DE VINYLE | [2021/41] |
Former [2018/29] | VERWENDUNG EINES SCHWEFEL- ODER PHOSPHORHALTIGEN POLYMERS ALS VERARBEITUNGSHILFE IN EINER POLYVINYLCHLORIDPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | ||
Former [2018/29] | UTILISATION D'UN POLYMÈRE CONTENANT DU PHOSPHORE OU DU SOUFRE EN TANT QU'AUXILIAIRE DE TRAITEMENT DANS UNE COMPOSITION POLYMÈRE DE POLY(CHLORURE DE VINYLE) | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 06.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2021 | 28.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2016 | AL | 06.04.2022 | AT | 06.04.2022 | CY | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | MK | 06.04.2022 | MT | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SE | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | TR | 06.04.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | IE | 08.09.2022 | LU | 08.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 08.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
MK | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
TR | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 08.09.2022 | ||
LU | 08.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 08.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
MK | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 08.09.2022 | ||
LU | 08.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 08.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 08.09.2022 | ||
LU | 08.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 08.09.2022 | ||
LU | 08.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 08.09.2022 | ||
LU | 08.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 08.09.2022 | ||
LU | 08.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 08.09.2022 | ||
LU | 08.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1153936 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,13,14,16,17,24-28 * examples 2,3 * * paragraph [0050] * [Y] 7,8,12; | [XY]US2005119419 (BLANCHARD PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,13-16,21,24-28 * examples 6,7 * * claims 1,6 * [Y] 18; | [X]US2007232771 (CHOI YI-RAC [KR], et al) [X] 24,28 * claims 1,2,4,5 * * examples 3,4 *; | [XYI]CN101402705 (YIYUAN RUIFENG POLYMER CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9-11,16,17,24-28 * abstract * [Y] 3,4,7,8,12,18,19 [I] 20; | [XY]US2010069552 (GUERRET OLIVIER [FR], et al) [X] 28 * claim 8 * * Example 2 - Test No. 10 *[Y] 18,19; | [XPY]WO2015145174 (SYNTHOMER UK LTD [GB]) [XP] 22-24,28 * claims 1, 25 * * page 49, line 7 - line 18 * [Y] 3,4 | Examination | - Holger Nilsson ET AL, "Suspension stabilizers for PVC production III: Control of resin porosity : Control of Resin Porosity", JOURNAL OF VINYL TECHNOLOGY., US, (19850901), vol. 7, no. 3, doi:10.1002/vnl.730070308, ISSN 0193-7197, pages 123 - 127, XP055749793 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/vnl.730070308 |