EP3348076 - METHOD OF FORMING AN ELECTRO-ACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER AND FORMED TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/29] | FABRICATING AN INTEGRATED LOUDSPEAKER PISTON AND SUSPENSION | ||
[2019/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bose Corporation The Mountain, MS 3B1 Framingham, Massachusetts 01701-9168 / US | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUTHY, Csaba c/o BOSE CORPORATION The Mountain MS 3B1 Framingham, Massachusetts 01701-9168 / US | 02 /
NIELSEN, Ole Mattis c/o BOSE CORPORATION The Mountain MS 3B1 Framingham, Massachusetts 01701-9168 / US | 03 /
HAYNER, Mark A. c/o BOSE CORPORATION The Mountain MS 3B1 Framingham, Massachusetts 01701-9168 / US | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Attali, Pascal Bose Intellectual Property 18, rue de la Bucherie 75005 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | Attali, Pascal BOSE Intellectual Property 26-28 avenue de Winchester 78100 Saint Germain en Laye / FR | Application number, filing date | 16767465.4 | 08.09.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016US50778 | Priority number, date | US201562216755P | 10.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562216755 P | US201615222539 | 28.07.2016 Original published format: US201615222539 | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017044625 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3348076 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3348076 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/06, H04R31/00, B81B3/00, // H04R7/04, H04R7/20, H04R9/04 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
H04R9/06 (EP,US);
H04R31/00 (EP,US);
H04R2201/003 (EP,US);
H04R2231/003 (EP,US);
H04R2307/025 (EP,US);
H04R2307/204 (EP,US);
H04R31/003 (EP,US);
H04R31/006 (EP,US);
H04R7/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/29] | H04R9/06, B81B3/00, H04R31/00, H04R7/04, H04R7/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTROAKUSTISCHEN WANDLERS UND HERGESTELLTER WANDLER | [2019/19] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING AN ELECTRO-ACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER AND FORMED TRANSDUCER | [2019/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN TRANSDUCTEUR ÉLECTROACOUSTIQUE ET TRANSDUCTEUR FORMÉ | [2019/19] |
Former [2018/29] | HERSTELLUNG EINES INTEGRIERTEN LAUTSPRECHERKOLBENS UND AUFHÄNGUNG | ||
Former [2018/29] | FABRICATING AN INTEGRATED LOUDSPEAKER PISTON AND SUSPENSION | ||
Former [2018/29] | FABRICATION D'UN PISTON ET D'UNE SUSPENSION INTÉGRÉS DE HAUT-PARLEUR | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 26.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed [2019/21] | 22.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19193605.3 / EP3591995 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2016 | AL | 06.11.2019 | AT | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | ES | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | IT | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | NL | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | RS | 06.11.2019 | SE | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | BG | 06.02.2020 | NO | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 08.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 06.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X] - IMAN SHAHOSSEINI ET AL, "Optimization and Microfabrication of High Performance Silicon-Based MEMS Microspeaker", IEEE SENSORS JOURNAL, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20130101), vol. 13, no. 1, doi:10.1109/JSEN.2012.2213807, ISSN 1530-437X, pages 273 - 284, XP011486310 [X] 1,6,7,10,11,26,27,34,36 * Table I; Section IV.;; figures 1, 3, 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSEN.2012.2213807 |