EP3199354 - LIQUID DISCHARGING HEAD AND RECORDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Naoki c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 02 /
IKEUCHI, Wataru c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2017/31] | Application number, filing date | 16768702.9 | 18.03.2016 | [2017/31] | WO2016JP58784 | Priority number, date | JP20150059681 | 23.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015059681 | [2017/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016152799 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3199354 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3199354 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
B41J2/14209 (EP,US);
B41J2/1433 (US);
B41J2/14 (US);
B41J2/14201 (US);
B41J2002/14225 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14306 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14419 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14459 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14467 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSSTOSSKOPF UND AUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/31] | English: | LIQUID DISCHARGING HEAD AND RECORDING DEVICE | [2017/31] | French: | TÊTE DE DÉCHARGE DE LIQUIDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2017 | Translation filed | 26.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 26.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2016 | AL | 23.01.2019 | AT | 23.01.2019 | CY | 23.01.2019 | CZ | 23.01.2019 | DK | 23.01.2019 | EE | 23.01.2019 | ES | 23.01.2019 | FI | 23.01.2019 | HR | 23.01.2019 | LT | 23.01.2019 | LV | 23.01.2019 | MC | 23.01.2019 | MK | 23.01.2019 | NL | 23.01.2019 | PL | 23.01.2019 | RO | 23.01.2019 | RS | 23.01.2019 | SE | 23.01.2019 | SI | 23.01.2019 | SK | 23.01.2019 | SM | 23.01.2019 | TR | 23.01.2019 | IE | 18.03.2019 | LU | 18.03.2019 | MT | 18.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | BG | 23.04.2019 | NO | 23.04.2019 | GR | 24.04.2019 | IS | 23.05.2019 | PT | 23.05.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 18.03.2016 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
MT | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
MT | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
MT | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 23.01.2019 | |
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 23.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2007149235 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 4; figure 2 * [A] 2-14; | [XA]EP2186642 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0038]; figures 1a,1b,7a,7b * [A] 2-14; | [A]EP2316649 (SII PRINTEK INC [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0052] - [0057]; figure 4 *; | [XA]US2013257991 (PANCHAWAGH HRISHIKESH V [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0029]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-14 | International search | [A]JP2009143168 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011079251 (FUJIFILM CORP, et al) [A] 1-17 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2011/0085012 A1 *; | [A]JP2011213094 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-17 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2011/0228012 A1 *; | [A]JP2012011629 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-17* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |