EP3275958 - ADHESIVE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, So Young LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Seung Min LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
SHIM, Jung Sup LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
YANG, Se Woo LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2018/05] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16769110.4 | 24.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016KR03001 | Priority number, date | KR20150040738 | 24.03.2015 Original published format: KR 20150040738 | [2018/05] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016153292 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3275958 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3275958 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09J9/00, C09J123/00, C09J123/22, C09J11/04, C08L63/00, C08K5/103, C09J7/35 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
C09J123/22 (EP,US);
C08L23/00 (KR);
C09J11/06 (US);
C08K5/0025 (KR);
C09J11/04 (EP,US);
C09J123/00 (EP,US);
C09J5/06 (US);
C09J7/35 (EP,US);
C09J9/00 (EP,US);
H10K50/84 (KR);
C08L2203/206 (EP,US);
C08L2666/78 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C09J123/22, C08L63/00, C08K5/103 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/10] | C09J9/00, C09J123/00, C09J123/22, C09J11/04, C08L63/00, C08K5/103 | ||
Former IPC [2018/05] | C09J9/00, C09J123/00, C09J123/22, C09J11/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAFTZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2018/05] | English: | ADHESIVE COMPOSITION | [2018/05] | French: | COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2017 | Translation filed | 17.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 17.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2016 | AL | 30.09.2020 | AT | 30.09.2020 | CY | 30.09.2020 | CZ | 30.09.2020 | DK | 30.09.2020 | EE | 30.09.2020 | ES | 30.09.2020 | FI | 30.09.2020 | HR | 30.09.2020 | IT | 30.09.2020 | LT | 30.09.2020 | LV | 30.09.2020 | MC | 30.09.2020 | MK | 30.09.2020 | MT | 30.09.2020 | NL | 30.09.2020 | PL | 30.09.2020 | RO | 30.09.2020 | RS | 30.09.2020 | SE | 30.09.2020 | SI | 30.09.2020 | SK | 30.09.2020 | SM | 30.09.2020 | BG | 30.12.2020 | NO | 30.12.2020 | GR | 31.12.2020 | IS | 30.01.2021 | PT | 01.02.2021 | IE | 24.03.2021 | LU | 24.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.03.2016 | |
AL | 30.09.2020 | ||
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
MK | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 24.03.2016 | |
AL | 30.09.2020 | ||
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
NO | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014315016 (DOLLASE THILO [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * claims 1,22 ** paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0036] , [0054] - [0057] - [0153] *; | [I]WO2015009129 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [I] 1-15 * claims 1,5,6,7,9,11,12,14 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] , [0050] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0060] * | International search | [A]KR20080030649 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1-17 * See abstract; paragraphs [0016]-[0102]; and claims 1-12. *; | [A]KR20090110132 (DONGWOO FINE CHEM CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-17 * See abstract; paragraphs [0022]-[0038]; and claims 1-10. *; | [A]KR20110014692 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-17* See abstract; and claims 1-24. *; | [XY]JP2012138509 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1, 3, 15, 16 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0076]; and claims 1-3. * [Y] 2, 4-14, 17; | [Y]KR20140136902 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 2, 4-14, 17 * See abstract; paragraphs [0015]-[0048]; and claims 1 and 17. * |