EP3274630 - BUBBLING FLUIDIZED BED COMBUSTION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING THE FLUIDIZED BED IN SUCH A COMBUSTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vattenfall AB 169 92 Stockholm / SE | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BADIEI, Shahriar Första Tvärgatan 19A 80284 Gävle / SE | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/05] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 16769174.0 | 23.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016SE50242 | Priority number, date | SE20150050364 | 25.03.2015 Original published format: SE 1550364 | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016153419 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3274630 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3274630 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F23C10/30, G01F23/284 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
F23C10/30 (EP,KR,SE,US);
F23C10/28 (SE);
F23C10/00 (SE);
F23N5/242 (EP,KR,US);
G01F23/28 (SE);
G01F23/284 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBRENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT BRODELNDER WIRBELSCHICHT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER WIRBELSCHICHT IN EINER DERARTIGEN VERBRENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/05] | English: | BUBBLING FLUIDIZED BED COMBUSTION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING THE FLUIDIZED BED IN SUCH A COMBUSTION DEVICE | [2018/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMBUSTION À LIT FLUIDISÉ À BULLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE LIT FLUIDISÉ DANS UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE COMBUSTION | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 09.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2016 | AL | 17.02.2021 | AT | 17.02.2021 | CY | 17.02.2021 | HR | 17.02.2021 | LT | 17.02.2021 | LV | 17.02.2021 | MC | 17.02.2021 | MK | 17.02.2021 | MT | 17.02.2021 | RO | 17.02.2021 | RS | 17.02.2021 | SE | 17.02.2021 | SI | 17.02.2021 | SM | 17.02.2021 | LU | 23.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | BG | 17.05.2021 | GR | 18.05.2021 | IS | 17.06.2021 | PT | 17.06.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 23.03.2016 | |
AL | 17.02.2021 | ||
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
MK | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 23.03.2016 | |
AL | 17.02.2021 | ||
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | HR | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | HR | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | HR | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | HR | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 17.02.2021 | |
PT | 17.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3922914 (FUCHS WALTER) [Y] 1-16 * column 2, line 1 - line 9 * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 33 * * column 4, line 53 - line 61 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]GB1548472 (CHEVRON RES) [Y] 5,7,13,15 * page 1, line 11 - line 13 * * page 1, line 38 - line 48 * * page 1, line 55 - line 64 * * page 2, line 35 - page 4, line 60 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2004025569 (DAMM HARTMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1,9* abstract *; | [Y]WO2008086543 (PET OIL & GAS CORP S AFRICA [ZA], et al) [Y] 1-4,6,8-12,14,16 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph l - page 7, paragraph l * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1317660 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [A] 1,9 * page 2, paragraph 5 * * page 3, paragraph 15 * * page 3, paragraph 21 - page 4, paragraph 27 * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPS57175902 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK); | [A]US5337289 (FASCHING GEORGE E [US], et al); | [A]WO0235206 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]); | [A]JP2003207382 (JFE ENG KK); | [A]JP2004144391 (EBARA CORP); | [A]US2014305357 (DESELLEM JAMES F [US], et al); | Examination | EP0305857 | by applicant | EP0305857 | JP2000042513 | WO2008086543 |