EP3270771 - WEARABLE APPARATUS WITH A STRETCH SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAXI, Amit S. E-503 Raunak Park Pokhran Road No.2 Thane (West) MH 400610 / IN | 02 /
MAGESHKUMAR, Vincent S. Jaydeep Co-op Hsg Society Plot-32 Flat-101 Sector-18 Koparkhairane Navi Mumbai MH 400709 / IN | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/04] | Rummler, Felix Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16769218.5 | 10.02.2016 | [2018/04] | WO2016US17415 | Priority number, date | US201514664095 | 20.03.2015 Original published format: US201514664095 | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016153621 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3270771 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/11, A61B5/01, A61B5/0488, A61B5/145 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
A61B5/1121 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/6801 (KR);
A61B5/6802 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/01 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/1118 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/14517 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/389 (EP,CN,KR);
A61B5/6828 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/6831 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/7225 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2562/0261 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2562/164 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2562/166 (EP,CN,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/04] | A61B5/00, A61B5/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Title | German: | WEARABLE-VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM DEHNUNGSSENSOR | [2018/04] | English: | WEARABLE APPARATUS WITH A STRETCH SENSOR | [2018/04] | French: | APPAREIL PORTABLE POURVU D'UN CAPTEUR D'ÉTIREMENT | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 17.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6360615 (SMELA ELISABETH [US]) [X] 1,2,4,9 * column 7, line 29 - column 8, line 6 * * column 8, line 37 - column 10, line 44 * * column 11, line 37 - column 12, line 8 * [I] 3,5-8,10-15; | [A]US2009024062 (EINARSSON PALMI [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US2010275338 (HYDE RODERICK A [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0030] * | International search | [Y]US5847639 (YANIGER STUART I [US]) [Y] 2, 5, 9-15, 18 * See abstract, column 3, line 62-column 4, line 16 and figure 3A. *; | [XYA]WO2006034291 (VIVOMETRICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1, 6-8, 16, 22, 23, 25 * See abstract, page 22, line 6-page 23, line 9, claims 50-61 and figures 78-9C. * [Y] 2, 5, 9-15, 17-21, 24 [A] 3, 4; | [A]US2012118066 (MAJIDI CARMEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-25* See abstract, paragraphs [18]-[33] and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]EP2783630 (ETH ZUERICH [CH]) [Y] 11-15, 17-21, 24 * See abstract, paragraphs [26]-[29], claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [A]WO2014204323 (STRETCHSENSE LTD [NZ]) [A] 1-25 * See abstract, page 12, lines 11-25 and figure 1. * |