EP3347727 - METHOD FOR LOCATING PARTIAL DISCHARGES IN AN ELECTRICAL APPARATUS, SYSTEM FOR LOCATING PARTIAL DISCHARGES AND COUPLING HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENNING, Jean-François 341 Rue de l'Ebène 73410 La Biolle / FR | 02 /
SARR, Assane 46 Rue Léon Jouhaux 38100 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
FIFI, Samuel 6 Place des Ecoles 73100 Aix-les-Bains / FR | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16769889.3 | 08.09.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016EP71162 | Priority number, date | FR20150058306 | 08.09.2015 Original published format: FR 1558306 | [2018/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017042261 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3347727 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/08, G01R31/12 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
G01R31/1254 (EP);
G01R31/08 (EP);
G01R31/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ORTUNG VON TEILENTLADUNGEN IN EINER ELEKTRISCHEN VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM ZUR ORTUNG VON TEILENTLADUNGEN UND KOPPELGEHÄUSE | [2018/29] | English: | METHOD FOR LOCATING PARTIAL DISCHARGES IN AN ELECTRICAL APPARATUS, SYSTEM FOR LOCATING PARTIAL DISCHARGES AND COUPLING HOUSING | [2018/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LOCALISATION DE DÉCHARGES PARTIELLES DANS UN APPAREILLAGE ÉLECTRIQUE, SYSTÈME DE LOCALISATION DE DÉCHARGES PARTIELLES ET BOITIER DE COUPLAGE | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 09.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/36] | 02.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP2726888 [ ] | [AD] - Stefan M Hoek ET AL, "New Procedures for Partial Discharge Localization in Gas-Insulated Switchgears in Frequency and Time Domain", (20070827), URL: http://www.uni-stuttgart.de/ieh/forschung/veroeffentlichungen/T7-547.pdf, (20160608), XP055278623 [AD] 1-12 * paragraph [02.3] - paragraph [2.3.3]; figures 6,10,14 * | [A] - S Tenbohlen ET AL, "Electromagnetic (UHF) PD Diagnosis of GIS, Cable Accessories and Oil-paper Insulated Power Transformers for Improved PD Detection and Localization (Germany) (Germany)", (20061231), URL: http://www.uni-stuttgart.de/ieh/forschung/veroeffentlichungen/CIGRE2006_Tenbohlen_D1-104.pdf, (20160608), XP055278955 [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 2.2] , [ 2.2.1] , [ 2.2.2]; figure 1 * | [ ] - DE S. M. HOEK, "New procédures for partial Discharge Localization in Gaz-Insulated Switchgears in Frequency and Time Domain", XVIH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON HIGH VOLTAGE ENGINEERING |