EP3275400 - ELECTRIC TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SP Berner Plastic Group, S.L. Camino de la Lloma 35 46960 Aldaia (Valencia) / ES | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESCARPA GIL, Julián Camino de la Lloma 35 46960 Aldaia (Valencia) / ES | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 16771444.3 | 23.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016ES70209 | Priority number, date | ES20150030359U | 27.03.2015 Original published format: ES 201530359 U | [2018/05] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016156641 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | ES | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3275400 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/26, A61C17/34, A61C17/22, A61C19/06 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
A61C17/225 (EP);
A61C17/26 (EP);
A61C17/349 (EP);
A61C19/066 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | A61C17/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE ZAHNBÜRSTE | [2018/05] | English: | ELECTRIC TOOTHBRUSH | [2018/05] | French: | BROSSE À DENTS ÉLECTRIQUE | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2017 | Translation filed | 27.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 27.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5170525 (CAFARO MICHAEL [CA]) [X] 1,2,4,6 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 27; figures 2,5 *; | [I]US2011067194 (AL-QAFFAS QASEM [KW]) [I] 1,2,4,6 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]US2009089950 (MOSKOVICH ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 2 * paragraph [0028]; claim 9 * * paragraph [0018] *; | [A]US4259761 (EARLE REDMOND B) [A] 2 * figure 1 * | International search | [A]CN201275155Y (TIANJIN ZHONGHUAN SANFENG ELEC [CN]) [A] 1-11 * , figures *; | [A]CN102846395 (TIANJIN ZHONGHUAN SANFENG ELECTRONIC CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , figures *; | [A]US2003126700 (JENG JOHNNY [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * , figure *; | [A]US2003221270 (KUO YOUTI [US]) [A] 1-11 * , figures *; | [A]CN2721042Y (ZHAO XIANGDONG [CN]) [A] 1-11 * , figures * |