EP3279644 - ROTATION METHOD, INSPECTION METHOD, BEARING MANUFACTURING METHOD, BEARING, ROTATION DEVICE, AND INSPECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Yutaka c/o NTN CORPORATION 105 Hidamarinooka 5-chome Kuwana-shi Mie 511-0867 / JP | 02 /
OOE, Hiroki c/o NTN CORPORATION 3066 Aza Oyumida Oaza Higashikata Kuwana-shi Mie 511-8678 / JP | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Bockhorni & Brüntjen Partnerschaft Patentanwälte mbB Agnes-Bernauer-Straße 88 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/06] | Bockhorni & Kollegen Elsenheimerstraße 49 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16772088.7 | 04.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016JP56794 | Priority number, date | JP20150069736 | 30.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015069736 | JP20150069737 | 30.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015069737 | [2018/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016158204 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3279644 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/84, F16C33/32, G01B11/30, G01M13/04, G01N21/88, F16C43/06, G01N21/95 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
F16C33/32 (EP,US);
F16C43/06 (US);
G01B11/30 (EP,US);
G01B5/0004 (EP);
G01M13/04 (EP,US);
G01N21/84 (US);
G01N21/88 (US);
G01N21/951 (EP,US);
F16C2220/62 (EP);
F16C2240/56 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/06] | G01N21/84, F16C33/32, G01B11/30, G01M13/04, G01N21/88 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Title | German: | ROTATIONSVERFAHREN, INSPEKTIONSVERFAHREN, LAGERHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, LAGER, ROTATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND INSPEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/06] | English: | ROTATION METHOD, INSPECTION METHOD, BEARING MANUFACTURING METHOD, BEARING, ROTATION DEVICE, AND INSPECTION DEVICE | [2018/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE ROTATION, PROCÉDÉ D'INSPECTION, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PALIER, PALIER, DISPOSITIF DE ROTATION, ET DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2017 | Translation filed | 28.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 28.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0972850 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [X]JP2000310619 (AMATSUJI STEEL BALL MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]JP2002277226 (AMATSUJI STEEL BALL MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JP2003232743 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US2008050005 (NAGASHIO MASAKI [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-3; claims 1-4 *; | [X]JP2012037424 (TSUBAKI NAKASHIMA CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [XY]JPH0972850 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [X] 5 * , paragraph [0002] (Family: none) *[Y] 4; | [XY]JP2000310619 (AMATSUJI STEEL BALL MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-3, 6-10 * , paragraphs [0009], [0010]; fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) * [Y] 4; | [XY]JP2002277226 (AMATSUJI STEEL BALL MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-3, 6-10 * , paragraphs [0022] to [0027]; fig. 4 to 7 & GB 2373580 A & TW 538240 B & CN 1375693 A & US 2002/0135756 A1 paragraphs [0039] to [0045]; fig. 4 to 7 * [Y] 4; | [XY]JP2003232743 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [X] 5 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0024] (Family: none) * [Y] 4; | [XY]JP2012037424 (TSUBAKI NAKASHIMA CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-3, 5-7, 9, 10 * , paragraphs [0001], [0003], [0034], [0051]; fig. 2, 8 & EP 2522644 A1 & TW 201132958 A & CN 102918006 A & US 2012/0274941 A1 paragraphs [0001], [0003], [0145], [0177]; fig. 9, 15 * [Y] 4 |