EP3279377 - COATED BASE FABRIC FOR AIRBAG, AIRBAG, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING COATED BASE FABRIC FOR AIRBAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSAKA, Taiki c/o Osaka Head Office Toray Industries, Inc. 3-3 Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8222 / JP | 02 /
YOKOI, Daisuke c/o Osaka Head Office Toray Industries, Inc. 3-3 Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8222 / JP | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/28] |
Former [2018/06] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 16772739.5 | 28.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016JP59923 | Priority number, date | JP20150069982 | 30.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015069982 | [2018/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016158858 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3279377 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3279377 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D03D1/02, B60R21/23, D06M15/643, D06M101/34 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
D03D1/02 (EP,KR,US);
B60R21/235 (US);
B60R21/23 (EP,KR,US);
D06M15/19 (US);
D06M15/643 (EP,KR,US);
B60R2021/23514 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETES BASISGEWEBE FÜR AIRBAG, AIRBAG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BESCHICHTETEN BASISGEWEBES FÜR AIRBAGS | [2018/06] | English: | COATED BASE FABRIC FOR AIRBAG, AIRBAG, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING COATED BASE FABRIC FOR AIRBAG | [2018/06] | French: | TISSU DE BASE REVÊTU POUR COUSSIN GONFLABLE DE SÉCURITÉ, COUSSIN GONFLABLE DE SÉCURITÉ, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE TISSU DE BASE REVÊTU POUR COUSSIN GONFLABLE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2017 | Translation filed | 25.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 25.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2016 | AL | 14.07.2021 | AT | 14.07.2021 | CY | 14.07.2021 | DK | 14.07.2021 | EE | 14.07.2021 | ES | 14.07.2021 | FI | 14.07.2021 | HR | 14.07.2021 | IT | 14.07.2021 | LT | 14.07.2021 | LV | 14.07.2021 | MC | 14.07.2021 | MK | 14.07.2021 | MT | 14.07.2021 | NL | 14.07.2021 | PL | 14.07.2021 | RS | 14.07.2021 | SE | 14.07.2021 | SI | 14.07.2021 | SK | 14.07.2021 | SM | 14.07.2021 | TR | 14.07.2021 | BG | 14.10.2021 | NO | 14.10.2021 | GR | 15.10.2021 | IS | 14.11.2021 | PT | 15.11.2021 | IE | 28.03.2022 | LU | 28.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 28.03.2016 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
MK | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
TR | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2022 | ||
LU | 28.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.03.2016 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
MK | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2022 | ||
LU | 28.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 28.03.2016 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2022 | ||
LU | 28.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 28.03.2016 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2022 | ||
LU | 28.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2022 | ||
LU | 28.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2022 | ||
LU | 28.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2022 | ||
LU | 28.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2042628 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * example 5 * * paragraph [0061] *; | [Y]EP2264235 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * example 17 * * paragraph [0053] *; | [I]JP2011058118 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [I] 1-6 * example 18; table 3 *; | [Y]EP2557210 (KOLON INC [KR]) [Y] 1-6 * tables 1, 2 * * examples 1-3 ** paragraph [0103] * | International search | [Y]JP2006052505 (UNITIKA FIBERS LTD) [Y] 1-6* , paragraph [0029] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010100988 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0018], [0049]; example 17 & US 2011/0036447 A1 paragraphs [0033], [0065]; example 17 & WO 2009/113325 A1 & EP 2264235 A1 & CN 102016143 A *; | [X]JP2011058118 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1-6 * , paragraph [0025]; example 18 (Family: none) * |