EP3273907 - APPLICATION OF ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS TO MEDICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. R. Bard, Inc. IP Law Group 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [2022/09] |
Former [2018/05] | For all designated states C. R. BARD, INC. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIAGARAJAN, Giridhar 831 E. Westminster Avenue Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US | 02 /
AMIN, Murtaza, Yusuf 209 Bayview Drive Farmington, UT 84025 / US | 03 /
MATSON, Jerrid 11234 Rhode Island Ave. N. Champlin, MN 55316 / US | [2018/10] |
Former [2018/05] | 01 /
THIAGARAJAN, Giridhar 222 L Street, Apt. 1 Salt Lake City, UT 84103 / US | ||
02 /
AMIN, Murtaza, Yusuf 209 Bayview Drive Farmington, UT 84025 / US | |||
03 /
MATSON, Jerrid 11234 Rhode Island Ave. N. Champlin, MN 55316 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 16774103.2 | 30.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016US25001 | Priority number, date | US201562140206P | 30.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562140206 P | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016160983 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3273907 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3273907 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, A61F2/07, A61L27/54, A61L29/02, A61L31/02, A61L31/08, A61L29/06, A61M39/02, A61M39/16, A61M39/22, A61M25/00, A61M25/02, A61L29/10, A61L29/16 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
A61L29/106 (EP,US);
A61L29/06 (EP,US);
A61L29/10 (US);
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61M1/3659 (EP,US);
A61M25/0009 (EP,US);
A61M25/0045 (EP,US);
A61M39/0247 (EP,US);
A61M39/162 (EP,US);
A61M39/22 (EP,US);
B29C45/00 (US);
B29C70/00 (US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0056 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0258 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0273 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0285 (EP,US);
A61M2207/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49885 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L29/06, C08L75/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | A61F2/06, A61F2/07, A61L27/54, A61L29/02, A61L31/02, A61L31/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANWENDUNG VON ANTIMIKROBIELLEN MITTELN AUF MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2018/05] | English: | APPLICATION OF ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS TO MEDICAL DEVICES | [2018/05] | French: | APPLICATION D'AGENTS ANTIMICROBIENS SUR DES DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 27.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22173228.2 / EP4062868 | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.08.2022 | AT | 17.08.2022 | CZ | 17.08.2022 | DK | 17.08.2022 | EE | 17.08.2022 | FI | 17.08.2022 | HR | 17.08.2022 | LT | 17.08.2022 | LV | 17.08.2022 | MC | 17.08.2022 | NL | 17.08.2022 | PL | 17.08.2022 | RO | 17.08.2022 | RS | 17.08.2022 | SE | 17.08.2022 | SI | 17.08.2022 | SK | 17.08.2022 | SM | 17.08.2022 | NO | 17.11.2022 | GR | 18.11.2022 | IS | 17.12.2022 | PT | 19.12.2022 | IE | 30.03.2023 | LU | 30.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/09] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
IE | 30.03.2023 | ||
LU | 30.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 30.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4592920 (MURTFELDT ROBERT L [US]) [X] 1-3,10,12,13 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 26 * * column 3, lines 47-65 * * column 5, lines 2-6 * * column 6, lines 20-44 * * claims 1-3, 14, 15 *; | [XI]EP0484680 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6,8-10,12,14,15 * figures 1-3 * * page 2, lines 3-7, 14-21, 43-57 * * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 19 * * examples 1, 3, 7-9 * * claims 1-7 * [I] 4,5,7,11; | [X]US2010215643 (CLEVENGER RANDELL [US], et al) [X] 1,3,10-13 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 23] , [0 38] , [0 64] , [0 75] , [0 79] * * example 2 ** claims 1, 7, 12, 40, 46, 70, 73, 76 * | International search | [Y]WO0128453 (ROY SUMIT [NO]) [Y] 11-12, 15-16, 29-30* ; page 7, lines 23-29 *; | [XY]WO2006133365 (NANOSET LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 19-23 * ; figures 18, 51, 52; pages 1, 8-11, 27 63 50 81 82; claim 16 * [Y] 3-18, 29-30; | [Y]US2008033522 (GREWE DAVID D [US], et al) [Y] 1, 3-4, 6-19, 24, 29-30 * ; figure 5; paragraphs [0009], [0010]. [0030], [0056], [0089]-[0091], [0106] *; | [Y]US2009145427 (GROEGER JOSEPH H [US], et al) [Y] 5, 17 * ; paragraph [0069]; claims 1, 4 *; | [Y]US2012083750 (SANSOUCY MICHAEL R [US]) [Y] 8, 9, 14, 29-30 * ; paragraph [0002]; claims 1, 8 *; | [Y]US2013138204 (KINUTA SEICHIN [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * ; paragraph [0061] * | Examination | US7820284 | by applicant | US4592920 | EP0484680 |