EP3347573 - DUMMY WHEEL DISK, AND METHOD FOR MACHINING BLADES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FÖHRIGEN, Andreas Westendallee 78 14052 Berlin / DE | 02 /
JUNG, Enno Tüsselstrasse 19 46147 Oberhausen / DE | 03 /
KOCH, Christian Albrecht Graf Wirichstrasse 27 45479 Mülheim / DE | 04 /
WEBER, Udo Leharstrasse 7 47661 Issum / DE | [2018/29] | Application number, filing date | 16774930.8 | 29.09.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016EP73181 | Priority number, date | DE201510220883 | 26.10.2015 Original published format: DE102015220883 | [2018/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017071905 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3347573 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3347573 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/28, F01D5/32, F01D5/30 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
F01D25/285 (EP);
F01D5/3015 (EP);
F01D5/3092 (EP);
F01D5/326 (EP);
F05D2230/10 (EP);
F05D2230/72 (EP);
F05D2230/80 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DUMMY-RADSCHEIBE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN VON SCHAUFELN | [2018/29] | English: | DUMMY WHEEL DISK, AND METHOD FOR MACHINING BLADES | [2018/29] | French: | FAUX DISQUE DE ROUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'USINAGE D'AUBES | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 23.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2016 | AL | 11.12.2019 | CY | 11.12.2019 | CZ | 11.12.2019 | DK | 11.12.2019 | EE | 11.12.2019 | ES | 11.12.2019 | FI | 11.12.2019 | HR | 11.12.2019 | LT | 11.12.2019 | LV | 11.12.2019 | MC | 11.12.2019 | MK | 11.12.2019 | MT | 11.12.2019 | NL | 11.12.2019 | PL | 11.12.2019 | RO | 11.12.2019 | RS | 11.12.2019 | SE | 11.12.2019 | SI | 11.12.2019 | SK | 11.12.2019 | SM | 11.12.2019 | TR | 11.12.2019 | BG | 11.03.2020 | NO | 11.03.2020 | GR | 12.03.2020 | IS | 11.04.2020 | PT | 06.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 29.09.2016 | |
AL | 11.12.2019 | ||
CY | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
MT | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.09.2016 | |
AL | 11.12.2019 | ||
CY | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MT | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 11.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3572970 (SMULAND ROBERT J) [Y] 9 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - line 55 * * figure - *; | [Y]US4512115 (MILLER ROBERT J [US]) [Y] 12-14 * abstract * * column 4, line 56 - column 6, line 40 ** figure - *; | [XYI]US5191711 (VICKERS THOMAS E [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * the whole document * [Y] 9,12-14 [I] 4-8,10,11 |