EP3356461 - POLYCARBONATE COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED STABILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/32] | POLYCARBONATE COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED STABILISATION | ||
[2019/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIDEL, Andreas Birnenweg 5 41542 Dormagen / DE | 02 /
HUFEN, Ralf Zum Röltgenhof 25 47239 Duisburg / DE | 03 /
THIEM, Hans-Jürgen Königsberger Straße 11 41539 Dormagen / DE | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16775664.2 | 29.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016EP73215 | Priority number, date | EP20150188176 | 02.10.2015 Original published format: EP 15188176 | [2018/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017055416 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3356461 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3356461 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/17, C08L69/00 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
C08L69/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/175 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/30 (US);
C08K3/32 (EP,KR);
C08K5/092 (EP,KR);
C08L51/04 (US);
C08L55/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L69/005 (KR);
C08K2003/3063 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/175, C08L69/00 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08K2003/329, C08L55/02 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08K3/32, C08L55/02 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08K5/092, C08L55/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYCARBONAT-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTER STABILISIERUNG | [2018/32] | English: | POLYCARBONATE COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED STABILIZATION | [2019/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYCARBONATE PRÉSENTANT UNE STABILISATION AMÉLIORÉE | [2019/25] |
Former [2018/32] | POLYCARBONATE COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED STABILISATION | ||
Former [2018/32] | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYCARBONATE PRÉSENTANT UNE MEILLEURE STABILITÉ | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 06.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2016 | AL | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | RS | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | NO | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 29.09.2016 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.09.2016 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 23.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0194719 (ENICHEM POLIMERI [IT]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, lines 30-43 * * examples 2, 5, 7-11 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE19753542 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, lines 3-19 * * page 10, lines 9-26 * * page 12, lines 19-20 * * claims 1, 3, 7-10 *; | [AD]WO2007065579 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 1, lines 2-5 * * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 13 * * page 11, lines 15-24 * * page 13, line 20 - page 15, line 2 * * tables 1, 2 * * claims 1, 4-6, 9, 14, 17, 18 *; | [A]WO2008122359 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, lines 4-6 * * page 2, lines 10-14, 33-34 * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 3 * * page 14, line 25 - page 16, line 5 * * page 17, line 1 - page 18, line 9 * * page 24, lines 16-20 * * table 1 * * claims 1, 7-12, 13-15 *; | [AD]WO2009118114 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 3, lines 5-11, 31-33 * * page 5, lines 12-13 * * page 22, lines 28-33 * * table 4 * * claims 1, 4, 5, 8, 9 *; | [AD]WO2010063381 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 1, lines 4-10 * * page 2, lines 4-26 * * page 14, line 10 - page 18, line 16 * * page 26, line 8 - page 27, line 3 * * examples 2, 3, 5, 7, 9, 10 ** claims 1, 11-15 * | by applicant | US3419634 | DE1900270 | DE1495626 | US3692744 | DE2232877 | DE2407674 | DE2407776 | DE2703376 | DE2714544 | DE2715932 | DE2842005 | DE3000610 | DE2940024 | DE3007934 | DE3334782 | WO8502622 | DE3832396 | JPH0218332B | EP0576950 | US2006287422 | WO2007065579 | WO2009118114 | WO2010063381 | WO2013060687 | WO2013060685 | - W. SCHOLTAN; H. LANGE, KOLLOID, Z. UND Z. POLYMERE, (1972), vol. 250, pages 782 - 796 | - Kunststoff-Handbuch, CARL-HANSER-VERLAG, (1973), vol. VIII, page 695 |