EP3356458 - PLASTICIZER COMPOSITION CONTAINING POLYMERIC DICARBOXYLIC ACID ESTERS AND PHTHALIC ACID DIALKYL ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFEIFFER, Matthias Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 13 67459 Böhl-Iggelheim / DE | 02 /
BREITSCHEIDEL, Boris Goethestrasse 72 67165 Waldsee / DE | 03 /
GRIMM, Axel Edesheimer Strasse 41 67480 Edenkoben / DE | 04 /
MORGENSTERN, Herbert Lindenweg 1 67158 Ellerstadt / DE | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16775670.9 | 29.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016EP73233 | Priority number, date | EP20150187711 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: EP 15187711 | [2018/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017055430 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3356458 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3356458 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/11, C08K5/12 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
C08K5/12 (EP,US);
C08G63/16 (US);
C08J5/18 (US);
C08K5/0016 (EP,US);
C08K5/11 (EP,US);
C08L27/06 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0016, C08L27/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/11, C08L27/06 (US,EP);
C08K5/12, C08L27/06 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEICHMACHER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIE POLYMERE DICARBONSÄUREESTER UND PHTHALSÄUREDIALKYLESTER ENTHÄLT | [2018/32] | English: | PLASTICIZER COMPOSITION CONTAINING POLYMERIC DICARBOXYLIC ACID ESTERS AND PHTHALIC ACID DIALKYL ESTERS | [2018/32] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PLASTIFIANT CONTENANT DES ESTERS D'ACIDE DICARBOXYLIQUE POLYMÈRES ET DES DIALKYLESTERS D'ACIDE PHTALIQUE | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 12.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.2020
11.02.2021
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED LANXESS Deutschland GmbH Kennedyplatz 1 50679 Köln / DE | [2021/11] |
Former [2020/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.2020
LANXESS Deutschland GmbH Kennedyplatz 1 50679 Köln / DE | 30.10.2020 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Opposition is deemed not to be filed 01 | 09.11.2020 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular right | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2016 | AL | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | IE | 29.09.2020 | LU | 29.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | AT | 29.09.2021 | [2023/07] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 29.09.2016 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MK | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 29.09.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 29.09.2016 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 29.09.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 29.09.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]CS243128 (DRAG JIRI [CS], et al) [X] 1-6,9-17,20,21 * page 3; examples B, C * [I] 7,8,18,19,22,23; | [ ] - DRAG JIRI ET AL, "Poly(vinyl chloride) paste with reduced migration of plasticizers", CAPLUS,, (19860515), XP002750533 [ ] * the whole document * | [A] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19841116), Database accession no. 24936-97-8, XP002764260 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | Opposition | WO9813413 | - Wickson, Edward J.,, "6.5 USE OF POLYMERIC/MONOMERIC BLENDS", Handbook of PVC Formulating, (19930000), pages 231 - 234, XP055740337 | - "Palatinol 10-P stab", Technisches Merkblatt, (20080100), XP055740344 | - "Safety Data Sheet Palamoll®", O-Basf, (20150917), vol. 652, XP055740345 | - "Technical Information Palamoll®", O-Basf, (20150200), vol. 654, XP055740349 | - "Technical Information Palamoll 656", O-BASF, vol. 656, pages 02 - 2015, XP055740356 | - Industrial Chemicals Notification, Palamoll®, vol. 654,656, pages 11 - 1998 | - "Improvements of long term stability of plasticized PVC", Präsentation bei der AMI Conference ''PVC-Formulation 2018, Köln, (20180411), XP055703344 | - "Technical Information Palamoll® 632", O-BASF, (20150200), XP055740363 | - "Fettsauren", Römpp Chemie Lexikon, (20101100), URL: https://roempp.thieme.de/lexicon/RD-06- 00664?searchterm=fetts%C3%A4uren, XP055740368 | - Jacob Maag, Carsten Lassen, Ulla Kristine Brandt, Jesper Kj0lholt, Lise Molander og Sonja Hagen Mikkelsen, "Identification and assessment of alternatives to selected phthalates", Studie Identification and assessment of alternatives to selected phthalates, Danish Ministry of the Environment, (20101028), URL: https://mst.dk/service/publikationer/publikationsarkiv/2010 /okt/identification- and-assessment-of-alternatives- to- selected-phthalates, XP055740375 |