EP3337804 - BIOCONJUGATES OF HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taizhou Huifeng Hetai Biotechnology Co. Ltd Suite 2006, Data Building-A 799 Yaocheng Ave. Taizhou, Jiangsu Providence 225300 / CN | [2021/33] |
Former [2019/43] | For all designated states Hunan SkyWorld Biotechnologies Co. Ltd. 9 Panpan Road Changsha Economic and Technical Development Zone 410100 Hunan / CN | ||
Former [2018/26] | For all designated states Arthus Biosystems LLC 13824 Leighfield Street Chantilly, VA 20151 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIUJUAN, Hao 13824 Leighfield Street Chantilly, VA 20151 / US | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 16777230.0 | 06.04.2016 | [2018/26] | WO2016US26279 | Priority number, date | US201562143790P | 06.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562143790 P | US201615091544 | 05.04.2016 Original published format: US201615091544 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016164504 | Date: | 13.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3337804 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 13.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/167, C07J43/00, G01N33/58, G01N33/68 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
C07J43/003 (EP,US);
C07H19/167 (EP,US);
G01N33/58 (EP,US);
G01N33/6815 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/26] | C07D473/34, C07D495/04, C07J17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Title | German: | BIOKONJUGATE VON HETEROCYCLISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2018/26] | English: | BIOCONJUGATES OF HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS | [2018/26] | French: | BIOCONJUGUÉS DE COMPOSÉS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES | [2018/26] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 03.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP22213174.0 / EP4219518 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009131643 (MONABIO INC [US], et al) [A] 2-6 * the whole document *; | [A]CN104046682 (SUZHOU BOTAIAN BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 2-6* the whole document *; | [Y] - BROWN LINDSEY J ET AL, "Using S-adenosyl-l-homocysteine capture compounds to characterize S-adenosyl-l-methionine and S-adenosyl-l-homocysteine binding proteins", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140827), vol. 467, doi:10.1016/J.AB.2014.08.013, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 14 - 21, XP029019554 [Y] 2-6 * the entire document, in particular abstract, scheme 1, pages 17 and 20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2014.08.013 | [Y] - CHRISTIAN DALHOFF ET AL, "Synthesis of S-Adenosyl-L-homocysteine Capture Compounds for Selective Photoinduced Isolation of Methyltransferases", CHEMBIOCHEM - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL BIOLOGY., DE, (20100125), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1002/cbic.200900349, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 256 - 265, XP055540878 [Y] 2-6 * schemes 1 to 4; page 257 - page 259 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200900349 | International search | [A]US5858803 (SCHENK ROLAND [DE], et al)[A] 2-13; | [PX]US2015268231 (HAO XIUJUAN [US], et al) [PX] 2-13 * , abstract, claims 4, 16, 19, 20, 22, 25 *; | [XA] - LENZ THOMAS et al., "Profiling of Methyltransferases and Other S-adenosyl-L- homocysteine-binding Proteins by Capture Compound Mass Spectrometry (CCMS", Journal of Visualized Experiments, (20100000), vol. 46, pages e2264/1 - 2264/9, XP055321208 [X] 2-8 * , abstract, fig.1A, 1B * [A] 9-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3791/2264 |