EP3280417 - XANTHINE-SUBSTITUTED ALKYNYL CARBAMATES/REVERSE CARBAMATES AS A2B ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lewis and Clark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Seminole Trail Suite 495 Charlottesville, Virginia 22901 / US | [2018/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, Robert 1180 Seminole Trail Suite 495 Charlottesville, Virginia 22901 / US | 02 /
BEAUGLEHOLE, Anthony 1180 Seminole Trail Suite 495 Charlottesville, Virginia 22901 / US | 03 /
WANG, Guoquan 1180 Seminole Trail Suite 495 Charlottesville, Virginia 22901 / US | [2018/07] | Representative(s) | Noréns Patentbyrå AB Box 10198 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [2018/07] | Application number, filing date | 16777436.3 | 08.04.2016 | [2018/07] | WO2016US26807 | Priority number, date | US201562144371P | 08.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562144371 P | [2018/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016164838 | Date: | 13.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3280417 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3280417 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/06, A61K31/522, A61P3/04, A61P3/10, A61P11/06, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
C07D473/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/522 (KR);
A61P11/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61P3/04 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | C07D473/06, A61K31/522, A61P3/04, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P11/06, A61P3/10 | ||
Former IPC [2018/07] | A61K31/522, C07D473/04, A61K31/519, A61K31/52, C07D473/00, C07D473/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | XANTHIN-SUBSTITUIERTE ALKYNYLCARBAMATE/REVERSE CARBAMATE ALS A2B-ANTAGONISTEN | [2019/37] | English: | XANTHINE-SUBSTITUTED ALKYNYL CARBAMATES/REVERSE CARBAMATES AS A2B ANTAGONISTS | [2018/07] | French: | CARBAMATES D'ALCYNYLE SUBSTITUÉS PAR XANTHINE/CARBAMATES INVERSES UTILISÉS EN TANT QU'ANTAGONISTES D'A2B | [2018/07] |
Former [2018/07] | XANTHIN-SUBSTITUIERTE ALKYNYLCARBAMATE/REVERSE-CARBAMATE ALS A2B-ANTAGONISTEN | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 31.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2018 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 23.07.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 23.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 08.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.05.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 08.05.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.2020 | Decision despatched | 08.05.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 08.05.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.10.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2016 | AL | 29.07.2020 | AT | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | HR | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | MK | 29.07.2020 | MT | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | RS | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SK | 29.07.2020 | SM | 29.07.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | NO | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | LU | 08.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 08.04.2016 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
MK | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
LU | 08.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 08.04.2016 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
LU | 08.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 08.04.2016 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
LU | 08.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
LU | 08.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 08.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
LU | 08.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006091896 (ADENOSINE THERAPEUTICS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 27; example - *; | [A]US2009163491 (THOMPSON ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2011005871 (PGXHEALTH LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * pages 42, 46; compounds 3C, 4Y, 4Z *; | [A] - MÜLLER, C.E. ET AL., "Recent developments in adenosine receptor ligands and their potential as novel drugs", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - BIOMEMBRANES, vol. 1808, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.BBAMEM.2010.12.017, ISSN 0005-2736, (2010), pages 1290 - 1308, (20101223), XP028157805 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1297; figure 7; compound 68 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbamem.2010.12.017 | International search | [A]US8044061 (MUELLER CHRISTA E [DE], et al) [A] 1-21 * entire document *; | [A]US2014275071 (CHENARD BERTRAND L [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * entire document *; | [A] - "CID 113701061", PUBCHEM, (20110320), Database accession no. 113701061, URL: ncbi, XP055319540 [A] 1-21 * . entire document * |