EP3284870 - CONSTRUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/08] | DISPLAY SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY | ||
[2024/09] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 16-1, HigashiUeno 2-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0015 / JP | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANARI Yasuhiko c/o Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 02 /
EDAMURA Manabu c/o Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 03 /
IZUMI Shiho c/o Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 04 /
KUROSE Takahiko c/o Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 16779853.7 | 10.03.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016JP57612 | Priority number, date | JP20150083664 | 15.04.2015 Original published format: JP 2015083664 | [2018/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016167061 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3284870 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3284870 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/26, // E02F3/32 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
E02F9/264 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/26 (US);
E02F9/261 (EP,KR,US);
G06T7/248 (US);
E02F3/32 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30241 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/08] | E02F9/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUMASCHINE | [2024/09] | English: | CONSTRUCTION MACHINE | [2024/09] | French: | MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION | [2024/09] |
Former [2018/08] | ANZEIGESYSTEM FÜR EINE BAUMASCHINE | ||
Former [2018/08] | DISPLAY SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY | ||
Former [2018/08] | SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE POUR UNE MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2017 | Translation filed | 15.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 24.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP5364742B ; | [I]WO2014103498 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [I]JP5603520B ; | [I]WO2014167740 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [E]US2016193920 (TSUBONE DAI [JP], et al); | [E]US10017919 (NOMURA AZUMI [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2001123476 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [Y]JP2001132021 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [Y]WO0240783 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2012172429 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [A]JP2013189760 (SUMITOMO CONSTR MACHINERY MFG); | [YA]JP5603520B ; | [A]JP2015001052 (CATERPILLAR SARL); | [EA]JP2016061054 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) |