EP3283407 - AUTONOMOUS ORDER FULFILLMENT AND INVENTORY CONTROL ROBOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invia Robotics, Inc. 5737 Kanan Road 185 Agoura Hills, California 91301 / US | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELAZARY, Lior c/o Invia Robotics, Inc. 5737 Kanan Road 185 Agoura Hills, California 91301 / US | 02 /
PARKS II, Daniel Frank 12133 Allin Street Los Angeles, California 90230 / US | 03 /
VOORHIES, Randolph Charles 3129 Roberts Avenue Culver City, California 90232 / US | [2018/09] |
Former [2018/08] | 01 /
ELAZARY, Lior 29315 Castlehill Drive Agoura Hills, California 91301 / US | ||
02 /
PARKS II, Daniel Frank 12133 Allin Street Los Angeles, California 90230 / US | |||
03 /
VOORHIES, Randolph Charles 3129 Roberts Avenue Culver City, California 90232 / US | Representative(s) | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2023/38] |
Former [2018/08] | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16780416.0 | 25.02.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016US19638 | Priority number, date | US201514688903 | 16.04.2015 Original published format: US201514688903 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016167886 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3283407 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3283407 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04, B25J19/02, B25J15/06, B25J5/00, G06Q30/06, B25J9/16, B66F9/06, B66F9/065, B66F9/07, B65G1/137, G06Q10/08, G06Q30/0601, G06Q10/087 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
B65G1/1373 (EP,US);
B25J15/0028 (US);
B25J15/06 (EP,US);
B25J15/0608 (EP,US);
B25J15/0616 (EP,US);
B25J19/022 (EP,US);
B25J19/023 (EP,US);
B25J19/04 (US);
B25J5/007 (EP,US);
B25J9/1697 (EP,US);
B65G1/0492 (US);
B66F9/063 (EP,US);
B66F9/065 (EP,US);
B66F9/07 (EP,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | B65G1/04, B25J19/02, B25J15/06, B25J5/00, G06Q30/06, B25J9/16, B66F9/06, B66F9/065, B66F9/07, B65G1/137, G06Q10/08 | ||
Former IPC [2018/08] | B65G1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTONOME AUFTRAGSERFÜLLUNGS- UND INVENTARKONTROLLROBOTER | [2018/08] | English: | AUTONOMOUS ORDER FULFILLMENT AND INVENTORY CONTROL ROBOTS | [2018/08] | French: | ROBOTS DE COMMANDE DE STOCK ET D'EXÉCUTION DE COMMANDES AUTONOMES | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 13.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.05.2023 | 03.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2023 | CZ | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | IT | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | NL | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SE | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4678390 (BONNETON MARC [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 9, line 63 - column 10, line 3 * * figures 1, 3, 4 * * column 13, line 5 - line 37 *; | [X]US5683222 (INGELHAG ANDERS GEORG PEDER [SE]) [X] 1,3,4 * figures 1-16 ** column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 11 *; | [X]JP2012056661 (TOYOTA IND CORP) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-16 * * paragraph [0005] *; | [XI]US2015032252 (GALLUZZO THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0051] * [I] 2,9 | International search | [A]US3750804 (LEMELSON J) [A] 1-8* , entire document *; | [Y]WO9001683 (PERCELL GROUP LTD [GB]) [Y] 6-8 * , entire document, especlalty pg 3, In 20 ? 35; pg 6, In 23- pg 7, In 7; *; | [A]US5219264 (MCCLURE VIRGE W [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * , entire document *; | [A]WO2014011459 (MERCURY CAPITAL MAN L L C [US]) [A] 1-8 * , entire document *; | [A]US8928481 (ABE TAKESHI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , entire document *; | [XY]US2015032252 (GALLUZZO THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * , entire document, especially fig. 1A-B; fig. 5A-B; para [0052-0053]; para [0076]; para [0085]; para [0057-0082]; claim 21f * [Y] 6-8 | by applicant | US4678390 | US5683222 | JP2012056661 | US2015032252 |